1 | 1 | | 86R5841 JTS-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Martinez H.B. No. 1646 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional |
---|
8 | 8 | | mobility authority comprehensive development agreements. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 223.201(b), Transportation Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | transferred to Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code, |
---|
12 | 12 | | redesignated as Section 223.2001, Transportation Code, and amended |
---|
13 | 13 | | to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 223.2001. DEFINITION. [(b)] In this subchapter, |
---|
15 | 15 | | "comprehensive development agreement" means an agreement that, at a |
---|
16 | 16 | | minimum, provides for the design and construction, reconstruction, |
---|
17 | 17 | | rehabilitation, expansion, or improvement of a project described in |
---|
18 | 18 | | Section 223.201(a) [Subsection (a)] and may also provide for the |
---|
19 | 19 | | financing, acquisition, maintenance, or operation of a project |
---|
20 | 20 | | described in that section [Subsection (a)]. |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code, |
---|
22 | 22 | | is amended by adding Section 223.2002 to read as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | Sec. 223.2002. LIMITATION. The department may enter into a |
---|
24 | 24 | | comprehensive development agreement only: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) for specific projects authorized under this |
---|
26 | 26 | | subchapter; or |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) as provided by Subchapter F. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 3. Sections 223.201(f) and (g), Transportation |
---|
29 | 29 | | Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (f) The department may enter into a comprehensive |
---|
31 | 31 | | development agreement [only] for all or part of[: |
---|
32 | 32 | | [(1)] the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project[; |
---|
33 | 33 | | [(2) the Interstate Highway 35E managed lanes project |
---|
34 | 34 | | in Dallas and Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S. |
---|
35 | 35 | | Highway 380; |
---|
36 | 36 | | [(3) the Interstate Highway 35W project in Tarrant |
---|
37 | 37 | | County from Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114; |
---|
38 | 38 | | [(4) the State Highway 183 managed lanes project in |
---|
39 | 39 | | Tarrant and Dallas Counties from State Highway 121 to Interstate |
---|
40 | 40 | | Highway 35E; |
---|
41 | 41 | | [(5) the Interstate Highway 35E/U.S. Highway 67 |
---|
42 | 42 | | Southern Gateway project in Dallas County, including: |
---|
43 | 43 | | [(A) Interstate Highway 35E from 8th Street to |
---|
44 | 44 | | Interstate Highway 20; and |
---|
45 | 45 | | [(B) U.S. Highway 67 from Interstate Highway 35E |
---|
46 | 46 | | to Farm-to-Market Road 1382 (Belt Line Road); |
---|
47 | 47 | | [(6) the State Highway 288 project from U.S. Highway |
---|
48 | 48 | | 59 to south of State Highway 6 in Brazoria County and Harris County; |
---|
49 | 49 | | [(7) the U.S. Highway 290 managed lanes project in |
---|
50 | 50 | | Harris County from Interstate Highway 610 to State Highway 99; |
---|
51 | 51 | | [(8) the Interstate Highway 820 project from State |
---|
52 | 52 | | Highway 183 to Randol Mill Road; |
---|
53 | 53 | | [(9) the State Highway 114 project in Dallas County |
---|
54 | 54 | | from State Highway 121 to State Highway 183; |
---|
55 | 55 | | [(10) the Loop 12 project in Dallas County from State |
---|
56 | 56 | | Highway 183 to Interstate Highway 35E; |
---|
57 | 57 | | [(11) the Loop 9 project in Dallas and Ellis Counties |
---|
58 | 58 | | from Interstate Highway 20 to U.S. Highway 67; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | [(12) the U.S. Highway 181 Harbor Bridge project in |
---|
60 | 60 | | Nueces County between U.S. Highway 181 at Beach Avenue and |
---|
61 | 61 | | Interstate Highway 37]. |
---|
62 | 62 | | (g) The department may combine in a comprehensive |
---|
63 | 63 | | development agreement under this subchapter: |
---|
64 | 64 | | (1) a toll project and a rail facility as defined by |
---|
65 | 65 | | Section 91.001; or |
---|
66 | 66 | | (2) two or more projects for which the department is |
---|
67 | 67 | | authorized under this subchapter to enter into a comprehensive |
---|
68 | 68 | | development agreement [described by Subsection (f)]. |
---|
69 | 69 | | SECTION 4. Section 223.2012(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
70 | 70 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
71 | 71 | | (a) In this section, the North Tarrant Express project is |
---|
72 | 72 | | the project on Interstate Highway 35W in Tarrant County from |
---|
73 | 73 | | Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114 that was [described by |
---|
74 | 74 | | Section 223.201(f)(3)] entered into on June 23, 2009. |
---|
75 | 75 | | SECTION 5. Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code, |
---|
76 | 76 | | is amended by adding Section 223.2014 to read as follows: |
---|
77 | 77 | | Sec. 223.2014. AUTHORIZED PROJECTS; EXPIRATION. (a) The |
---|
78 | 78 | | department may enter into a comprehensive development agreement for |
---|
79 | 79 | | any project for which the department was authorized to enter into a |
---|
80 | 80 | | comprehensive development agreement on September 1, 2013. |
---|
81 | 81 | | (b) This section expires August 31, 2029. |
---|
82 | 82 | | SECTION 6. Section 370.305(c), Transportation Code, is |
---|
83 | 83 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
84 | 84 | | (c) An authority may enter into a comprehensive development |
---|
85 | 85 | | agreement only: |
---|
86 | 86 | | (1) for specific projects authorized under this |
---|
87 | 87 | | subchapter; or |
---|
88 | 88 | | (2) as provided by Subchapter K [Except as provided by |
---|
89 | 89 | | this chapter, an authority's authority to enter into a |
---|
90 | 90 | | comprehensive development agreement expires on August 31, 2011]. |
---|
91 | 91 | | SECTION 7. Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code, |
---|
92 | 92 | | is amended by adding Section 370.3051 to read as follows: |
---|
93 | 93 | | Sec. 370.3051. AUTHORIZED PROJECTS FOR COMPREHENSIVE |
---|
94 | 94 | | DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS; EXPIRATION. (a) A regional mobility |
---|
95 | 95 | | authority may enter into a comprehensive development agreement for |
---|
96 | 96 | | any project for which the authority was authorized to enter into a |
---|
97 | 97 | | comprehensive development agreement on September 1, 2013. |
---|
98 | 98 | | (b) This section expires August 31, 2029. |
---|
99 | 99 | | SECTION 8. The following provisions of the Transportation |
---|
100 | 100 | | Code are repealed: |
---|
101 | 101 | | (1) Sections 223.201(i), (j), (k), (l), and (m); and |
---|
102 | 102 | | (2) Section 223.2011. |
---|
103 | 103 | | SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|