Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1646 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/12/2019

                            86R5841 JTS-D
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 1646


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Texas Department of Transportation and regional
 mobility authority comprehensive development agreements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 223.201(b), Transportation Code, is
 transferred to Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
 redesignated as Section 223.2001, Transportation Code, and amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2001.  DEFINITION.  [(b)] In this subchapter,
 "comprehensive development agreement" means an agreement that, at a
 minimum, provides for the design and construction, reconstruction,
 rehabilitation, expansion, or improvement of a project described in
 Section 223.201(a) [Subsection (a)] and may also provide for the
 financing, acquisition, maintenance, or operation of a project
 described in that section [Subsection (a)].
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 223.2002 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2002.  LIMITATION. The department may enter into a
 comprehensive development agreement only:
 (1)  for specific projects authorized under this
 subchapter; or
 (2)  as provided by Subchapter F.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 223.201(f) and (g), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (f)  The department may enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement [only] for all or part of[:
 [(1)]  the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project[;
 [(2)     the Interstate Highway 35E managed lanes project
 in Dallas and Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S.
 Highway 380;
 [(3)     the Interstate Highway 35W project in Tarrant
 County from Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114;
 [(4)     the State Highway 183 managed lanes project in
 Tarrant and Dallas Counties from State Highway 121 to Interstate
 Highway 35E;
 [(5)     the Interstate Highway 35E/U.S. Highway 67
 Southern Gateway project in Dallas County, including:
 [(A)     Interstate Highway 35E from 8th Street to
 Interstate Highway 20; and
 [(B)     U.S. Highway 67 from Interstate Highway 35E
 to Farm-to-Market Road 1382 (Belt Line Road);
 [(6)     the State Highway 288 project from U.S. Highway
 59 to south of State Highway 6 in Brazoria County and Harris County;
 [(7)     the U.S. Highway 290 managed lanes project in
 Harris County from Interstate Highway 610 to State Highway 99;
 [(8)     the Interstate Highway 820 project from State
 Highway 183 to Randol Mill Road;
 [(9)     the State Highway 114 project in Dallas County
 from State Highway 121 to State Highway 183;
 [(10)     the Loop 12 project in Dallas County from State
 Highway 183 to Interstate Highway 35E;
 [(11)     the Loop 9 project in Dallas and Ellis Counties
 from Interstate Highway 20 to U.S. Highway 67; and
 [(12)     the U.S. Highway 181 Harbor Bridge project in
 Nueces County between U.S. Highway 181 at Beach Avenue and
 Interstate Highway 37].
 (g)  The department may combine in a comprehensive
 development agreement under this subchapter:
 (1)  a toll project and a rail facility as defined by
 Section 91.001; or
 (2)  two or more projects for which the department is
 authorized under this subchapter to enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement [described by Subsection (f)].
 SECTION 4.  Section 223.2012(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, the North Tarrant Express project is
 the project on Interstate Highway 35W in Tarrant County from
 Interstate Highway 30 to State Highway 114 that was [described by
 Section 223.201(f)(3)] entered into on June 23, 2009.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter E, Chapter 223, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 223.2014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 223.2014.  AUTHORIZED PROJECTS; EXPIRATION. (a) The
 department may enter into a comprehensive development agreement for
 any project for which the department was authorized to enter into a
 comprehensive development agreement on September 1, 2013.
 (b)  This section expires August 31, 2029.
 SECTION 6.  Section 370.305(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  An authority may enter into a comprehensive development
 agreement only:
 (1)  for specific projects authorized under this
 subchapter; or
 (2)  as provided by Subchapter K [Except as provided by
 this chapter, an authority's authority to enter into a
 comprehensive development agreement expires on August 31, 2011].
 SECTION 7.  Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 370.3051 to read as follows:
 Sec. 370.3051.  AUTHORIZED PROJECTS FOR COMPREHENSIVE
 DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS; EXPIRATION. (a) A regional mobility
 authority may enter into a comprehensive development agreement for
 any project for which the authority was authorized to enter into a
 comprehensive development agreement on September 1, 2013.
 (b)  This section expires August 31, 2029.
 SECTION 8.  The following provisions of the Transportation
 Code are repealed:
 (1)  Sections 223.201(i), (j), (k), (l), and (m); and
 (2)  Section 223.2011.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.