Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1647 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/30/2019

                            86R22298 JG-D
 By: Deshotel, Davis of Harris H.B. No. 1647
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1647:
 By:  Noble C.S.H.B. No. 1647


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the development of a dental services benefit under
 Medicaid for adult recipients with disabilities and a pilot program
 to provide those services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.0545 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0545.  DENTAL SERVICES BENEFIT FOR CERTAIN
 RECIPIENTS; PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The commission shall develop a
 dental services benefit under the medical assistance program for
 adult recipients with disabilities. The dental services benefit
 must be:
 (1)  cost-effective and designed to achieve cost
 savings;
 (2)  designed to reduce emergency room visits by or
 hospitalizations of adult recipients with disabilities resulting
 from a lack of access to dental services; and
 (3)  designed to meet the individual needs of adult
 recipients with disabilities.
 (b)  In developing the dental services benefit under this
 section, the commission shall evaluate dental services benefits
 provided under medical assistance waiver programs authorized under
 Section 1115 of the federal Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section
 1315) and dental services benefits provided as a value-added
 service under the Medicaid managed care delivery model.
 (c)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the commission shall
 prepare and submit to the legislature a written report on the dental
 services benefit developed under this section.
 (d)  The commission may establish and operate a pilot program
 to provide the dental services benefit developed under this section
 in one or more geographic areas of this state. The pilot program
 must conclude not later than September 1, 2022. If the commission
 establishes the pilot program under this section, the commission
 shall prepare and submit to the legislature a written report that
 summarizes the results of the pilot program not later than December
 1, 2022.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.