Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1669 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1669
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2019;
3- April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4- Human Services; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5- Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6- May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1669 By: Perry
1+86R7287 JG-D
2+ By: Lucio III H.B. No. 1669
93
104
115 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
126 AN ACT
13- relating to increasing and improving the mental health and
14- substance use disorder workforce in this state and increasing the
15- capacity of local mental health authorities to provide access to
16- mental health services in certain counties.
7+ relating to a comprehensive plan for increasing and improving the
8+ workforce in this state that serves persons with mental health and
9+ substance use issues.
1710 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1811 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
19- amended by adding Sections 531.0221 and 531.02253 to read as
20- follows:
21- Sec. 531.0221. INITIATIVE TO INCREASE MENTAL HEALTH
22- SERVICES CAPACITY IN RURAL AREAS. (a) In this section, "local
23- mental health authority group" means a group of local mental health
24- authorities established under Subsection (b)(2).
25- (b) Not later than January 1, 2020, the commission, using
26- existing resources, shall:
27- (1) identify each local mental health authority that
28- is located in a county with a population of 250,000 or less or that
29- the commission determines provides services predominantly in a
30- county with a population of 250,000 or less;
31- (2) in a manner that the commission determines will
32- best achieve the reductions described by Subsection (d), assign the
33- authorities identified under Subdivision (1) to regional groups of
34- at least two authorities; and
35- (3) notify each authority identified under
36- Subdivision (1):
37- (A) that the commission has identified the
38- authority under that subdivision; and
39- (B) which local mental health authority group the
40- commission assigned the authority to under Subdivision (2).
41- (c) The commission, using existing resources, shall develop
42- a mental health services development plan for each local mental
43- health authority group that will increase the capacity of the
44- authorities in the group to provide access to needed services.
45- (d) In developing a plan under Subsection (c), the
46- commission shall focus on reducing:
47- (1) the cost to local governments of providing
48- services to persons experiencing a mental health crisis;
49- (2) the transportation of persons served by an
50- authority in the local mental health authority group to mental
51- health facilities;
52- (3) the incarceration of persons with mental illness
53- in county jails that are located in an area served by an authority
54- in the local mental health authority group; and
55- (4) the number of hospital emergency room visits by
56- persons with mental illness at hospitals located in an area served
57- by an authority in the local mental health authority group.
58- (e) In developing a plan under Subsection (c):
59- (1) the commission shall assess the capacity of the
60- authorities in the local mental health authority group to provide
61- access to needed services; and
62- (2) the commission and the local mental health
63- authority group shall evaluate:
64- (A) whether and to what degree increasing the
65- capacity of the authorities in the local mental health authority
66- group to provide access to needed services would offset the cost to
67- state or local governmental entities of:
68- (i) the transportation of persons for
69- mental health services to facilities that are not local providers;
70- (ii) admissions to and inpatient
71- hospitalizations at state hospitals or other treatment facilities;
72- (iii) the provision of services by hospital
73- emergency rooms to persons with mental illness who are served by or
74- reside in an area served by an authority in the local mental health
75- authority group; and
76- (iv) the incarceration in county jails of
77- persons with mental illness who are served by or reside in an area
78- served by an authority in the local mental health authority group;
79- (B) whether available state funds or grant
80- funding sources could be used to fund the plan; and
81- (C) what measures would be necessary to ensure
82- that the plan aligns with the statewide behavioral health strategic
83- plan and the comprehensive inpatient mental health plan.
84- (f) In each mental health services development plan
85- produced under this section, the commission, in collaboration with
86- the local mental health authority group, shall determine a method
87- of increasing the capacity of the authorities in the local mental
88- health authority group to provide access to needed services.
89- (g) The commission shall compile and evaluate each mental
90- health services development plan produced under this section and
91- determine:
92- (1) the cost-effectiveness of each plan; and
93- (2) how each plan would improve the delivery of mental
94- health treatment and care to residents in the service areas of the
95- authorities in the local mental health authority group.
96- (h) Not later than December 1, 2020, the commission, using
97- existing resources, shall produce and publish on its Internet
98- website a report containing:
99- (1) the commission's evaluation of each plan under
100- Subsection (g);
101- (2) each mental health services development plan
102- evaluated by the commission under Subsection (g); and
103- (3) a comprehensive statewide analysis of mental
104- health services in counties with a population of 250,000 or less,
105- including recommendations to the legislature for implementing the
106- plans developed under this section.
107- (i) The commission and the authorities in each local mental
108- health authority group may implement a mental health services
109- development plan evaluated by the commission under this section if
110- the commission and the local mental health authority group to which
111- the plan applies identify a method of funding that implementation.
112- (j) This section expires September 1, 2021.
12+ amended by adding Section 531.02253 to read as follows:
11313 Sec. 531.02253. COMPREHENSIVE WORKFORCE PLAN FOR MENTAL
114- HEALTH AND SUBSTANCE USE. (a) The statewide behavioral health
115- coordinating council, under the direction of the commission, shall
116- develop and the commission shall implement a comprehensive plan to
117- increase and improve the workforce in this state to serve persons
118- with mental health and substance use issues. In developing the
119- plan, the council shall analyze and consider available studies,
120- reports, and recommendations regarding that segment of the
121- workforce in this state or elsewhere.
14+ HEALTH AND SUBSTANCE USE. (a) The commission shall develop and
15+ implement a comprehensive plan to increase and improve the
16+ workforce in this state to serve persons with mental health and
17+ substance use issues. In developing the plan, the commission shall
18+ analyze and consider available studies, reports, and
19+ recommendations regarding that segment of the workforce in this
20+ state or elsewhere.
12221 (b) The plan must include:
12322 (1) a strategy and timeline for implementing the plan,
12423 including short-term, medium-term, and long-term goals;
12524 (2) a system for monitoring the implementation of the
12625 plan; and
12726 (3) a method for evaluating the outcomes of the plan.
128- SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2020, the statewide
129- behavioral health coordinating council shall develop and the Health
130- and Human Services Commission shall begin implementing the plan
131- required under Section 531.02253, Government Code, as added by this
132- Act.
133- SECTION 3. The statewide behavioral health coordinating
134- council and the Health and Human Services Commission are required
135- to implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
136- appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
137- legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
138- purpose, the council and the commission may, but are not required
139- to, implement the provision using other appropriations made to the
140- commission that are available for that purpose.
141- SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
142- * * * * *
27+ SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2020, the Health and
28+ Human Services Commission shall develop and begin implementing the
29+ plan required under Section 531.02253, Government Code, as added by
30+ this Act.
31+ SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.