Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1669 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/19/2019

                            By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 1669
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2019;
 April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1669 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing and improving the mental health and
 substance use disorder workforce in this state and increasing the
 capacity of local mental health authorities to provide access to
 mental health services in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 531.0221 and 531.02253 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 531.0221.  INITIATIVE TO INCREASE MENTAL HEALTH
 SERVICES CAPACITY IN RURAL AREAS. (a)  In this section, "local
 mental health authority group" means a group of local mental health
 authorities established under Subsection (b)(2).
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2020, the commission, using
 existing resources, shall:
 (1)  identify each local mental health authority that
 is located in a county with a population of 250,000 or less or that
 the commission determines provides services predominantly in a
 county with a population of 250,000 or less;
 (2)  in a manner that the commission determines will
 best achieve the reductions described by Subsection (d), assign the
 authorities identified under Subdivision (1) to regional groups of
 at least two authorities; and
 (3)  notify each authority identified under
 Subdivision (1):
 (A)  that the commission has identified the
 authority under that subdivision; and
 (B)  which local mental health authority group the
 commission assigned the authority to under Subdivision (2).
 (c)  The commission, using existing resources, shall develop
 a mental health services development plan for each local mental
 health authority group that will increase the capacity of the
 authorities in the group to provide access to needed services.
 (d)  In developing a plan under Subsection (c), the
 commission shall focus on reducing:
 (1)  the cost to local governments of providing
 services to persons experiencing a mental health crisis;
 (2)  the transportation of persons served by an
 authority in the local mental health authority group to mental
 health facilities;
 (3)  the incarceration of persons with mental illness
 in county jails that are located in an area served by an authority
 in the local mental health authority group; and
 (4)  the number of hospital emergency room visits by
 persons with mental illness at hospitals located in an area served
 by an authority in the local mental health authority group.
 (e)  In developing a plan under Subsection (c):
 (1)  the commission shall assess the capacity of the
 authorities in the local mental health authority group to provide
 access to needed services; and
 (2)  the commission and the local mental health
 authority group shall evaluate:
 (A)  whether and to what degree increasing the
 capacity of the authorities in the local mental health authority
 group to provide access to needed services would offset the cost to
 state or local governmental entities of:
 (i)  the transportation of persons for
 mental health services to facilities that are not local providers;
 (ii)  admissions to and inpatient
 hospitalizations at state hospitals or other treatment facilities;
 (iii)  the provision of services by hospital
 emergency rooms to persons with mental illness who are served by or
 reside in an area served by an authority in the local mental health
 authority group; and
 (iv)  the incarceration in county jails of
 persons with mental illness who are served by or reside in an area
 served by an authority in the local mental health authority group;
 (B)  whether available state funds or grant
 funding sources could be used to fund the plan; and
 (C)  what measures would be necessary to ensure
 that the plan aligns with the statewide behavioral health strategic
 plan and the comprehensive inpatient mental health plan.
 (f)  In each mental health services development plan
 produced under this section, the commission, in collaboration with
 the local mental health authority group, shall determine a method
 of increasing the capacity of the authorities in the local mental
 health authority group to provide access to needed services.
 (g)  The commission shall compile and evaluate each mental
 health services development plan produced under this section and
 determine:
 (1)  the cost-effectiveness of each plan; and
 (2)  how each plan would improve the delivery of mental
 health treatment and care to residents in the service areas of the
 authorities in the local mental health authority group.
 (h)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the commission, using
 existing resources, shall produce and publish on its Internet
 website a report containing:
 (1)  the commission's evaluation of each plan under
 Subsection (g);
 (2)  each mental health services development plan
 evaluated by the commission under Subsection (g); and
 (3)  a comprehensive statewide analysis of mental
 health services in counties with a population of 250,000 or less,
 including recommendations to the legislature for implementing the
 plans developed under this section.
 (i)  The commission and the authorities in each local mental
 health authority group may implement a mental health services
 development plan evaluated by the commission under this section if
 the commission and the local mental health authority group to which
 the plan applies identify a method of funding that implementation.
 (j)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 Sec. 531.02253.  COMPREHENSIVE WORKFORCE PLAN FOR MENTAL
 HEALTH AND SUBSTANCE USE. (a)  The statewide behavioral health
 coordinating council, under the direction of the commission, shall
 develop and the commission shall implement a comprehensive plan to
 increase and improve the workforce in this state to serve persons
 with mental health and substance use issues. In developing the
 plan, the council shall analyze and consider available studies,
 reports, and recommendations regarding that segment of the
 workforce in this state or elsewhere.
 (b)  The plan must include:
 (1)  a strategy and timeline for implementing the plan,
 including short-term, medium-term, and long-term goals;
 (2)  a system for monitoring the implementation of the
 plan; and
 (3)  a method for evaluating the outcomes of the plan.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2020, the statewide
 behavioral health coordinating council shall develop and the Health
 and Human Services Commission shall begin implementing the plan
 required under Section 531.02253, Government Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  The statewide behavioral health coordinating
 council and the Health and Human Services Commission are required
 to implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the council and the commission may, but are not required
 to, implement the provision using other appropriations made to the
 commission that are available for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *