1 | | - | H.B. No. 170 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Bernal, et al. H.B. No. 170 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado, Menéndez) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 5 | + | Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 170 By: Nichols |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to coverage for mammography under certain health benefit |
---|
6 | 15 | | plans. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 1356.001, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 18 | | adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 19 | | (1-a) "Diagnostic mammogram" means an imaging |
---|
11 | 20 | | examination designed to evaluate: |
---|
12 | 21 | | (A) a subjective or objective abnormality |
---|
13 | 22 | | detected by a physician in a breast; |
---|
14 | 23 | | (B) an abnormality seen by a physician on a |
---|
15 | 24 | | screening mammogram; |
---|
16 | 25 | | (C) an abnormality previously identified by a |
---|
17 | 26 | | physician as probably benign in a breast for which follow-up |
---|
18 | 27 | | imaging is recommended by a physician; or |
---|
19 | 28 | | (D) an individual with a personal history of |
---|
20 | 29 | | breast cancer. |
---|
21 | 30 | | SECTION 2. Section 1356.002, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
22 | 31 | | amending Subsection (g) and adding Subsection (i) to read as |
---|
23 | 32 | | follows: |
---|
24 | 33 | | (g) Notwithstanding any provision in Chapter 1551, 1575, |
---|
25 | 34 | | 1579, or 1601 or any other law, this chapter applies to: |
---|
26 | 35 | | (1) a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551; |
---|
27 | 36 | | (2) a basic plan under Chapter 1575; |
---|
28 | 37 | | (3) a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579; |
---|
29 | 38 | | and |
---|
30 | 39 | | (4) basic coverage under Chapter 1601. |
---|
31 | 40 | | (i) To the extent allowed by federal law, this chapter |
---|
32 | 41 | | applies to: |
---|
33 | 42 | | (1) the state Medicaid program operated under Chapter |
---|
34 | 43 | | 32, Human Resources Code; and |
---|
35 | 44 | | (2) a Medicaid managed care program operated under |
---|
36 | 45 | | Chapter 533, Government Code. |
---|
37 | 46 | | SECTION 3. Section 1356.005, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
38 | 47 | | adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
39 | 48 | | (a-1) A health benefit plan that provides coverage for a |
---|
40 | 49 | | screening mammogram must provide coverage for a diagnostic |
---|
41 | 50 | | mammogram that is no less favorable than the coverage for a |
---|
42 | 51 | | screening mammogram. |
---|
43 | 52 | | SECTION 4. Section 1356.0021, Insurance Code, is repealed. |
---|
44 | 53 | | SECTION 5. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
45 | 54 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
46 | 55 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
47 | 56 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
48 | 57 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
49 | 58 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
50 | 59 | | SECTION 6. This Act applies only to a health benefit plan |
---|
51 | 60 | | that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after |
---|
52 | 61 | | January 1, 2020. A health benefit plan that is delivered, issued |
---|
53 | 62 | | for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2020, is governed by the |
---|
54 | 63 | | law as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, |
---|
55 | 64 | | and that law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
56 | 65 | | SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
57 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
58 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
59 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 170 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
60 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 16, 2 present, not |
---|
61 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
62 | | - | No. 170 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 13, |
---|
63 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
66 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 170 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
67 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays |
---|
68 | | - | 5. |
---|
69 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
71 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Date |
---|
73 | | - | __________________ |
---|
74 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 66 | + | * * * * * |
---|