Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB170 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2019

                            H.B. No. 170


 AN ACT
 relating to coverage for mammography under certain health benefit
 plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1356.001, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows:
 (1-a) "Diagnostic mammogram" means an imaging
 examination designed to evaluate:
 (A)  a subjective or objective abnormality
 detected by a physician in a breast;
 (B)  an abnormality seen by a physician on a
 screening mammogram;
 (C)  an abnormality previously identified by a
 physician as probably benign in a breast for which follow-up
 imaging is recommended by a physician; or
 (D)  an individual with a personal history of
 breast cancer.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1356.002, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (g) and adding Subsection (i) to read as
 follows:
 (g)  Notwithstanding any provision in Chapter 1551, 1575,
 1579, or 1601 or any other law, this chapter applies to:
 (1)  a basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
 (2)  a basic plan under Chapter 1575;
 (3)  a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579;
 and
 (4)  basic coverage under Chapter 1601.
 (i)  To the extent allowed by federal law, this chapter
 applies to:
 (1)  the state Medicaid program operated under Chapter
 32, Human Resources Code; and
 (2)  a Medicaid managed care program operated under
 Chapter 533, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1356.005, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A health benefit plan that provides coverage for a
 screening mammogram must provide coverage for a diagnostic
 mammogram that is no less favorable than the coverage for a
 screening mammogram.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1356.0021, Insurance Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 5.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 6.  This Act applies only to a health benefit plan
 that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after
 January 1, 2020. A health benefit plan that is delivered, issued
 for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2020, is governed by the
 law as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 170 was passed by the House on May 3,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 124, Nays 16, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 170 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 128, Nays 13,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 170 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 26, Nays
 5.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor