House | 04/29/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Referred to County Affairs | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/13/2019 | Filed |