Senate | 05/13/2019 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Record vote RV#1226 | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Passed as amended | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Amended 1-Cortez | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Amended 4-S. Davis | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Amended 3-S. Davis | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Amended 2-Clardy | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | Filed |