9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 531.021611 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 531.021611. ACTION PLAN TO EXPAND TELEMEDICINE MEDICAL |
---|
13 | 13 | | SERVICES AND TELEHEALTH SERVICES. (a) The commission shall |
---|
14 | 14 | | develop and implement an action plan to: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) expand the use of and increase access to |
---|
16 | 16 | | telemedicine medical services, telehealth services, and related |
---|
17 | 17 | | mobile applications for those services by health care providers for |
---|
18 | 18 | | the residents of this state; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) increase the availability of critical medical care |
---|
20 | 20 | | and health care services to residents in this state in areas |
---|
24 | | - | (1) evaluate, in collaboration with the Maternal |
---|
25 | | - | Mortality and Morbidity Task Force established under Chapter 34, |
---|
26 | | - | Health and Safety Code, and other interested persons, the use of |
---|
27 | | - | telemedicine medical services for women during pregnancy and the |
---|
28 | | - | postpartum period; |
---|
29 | | - | (2) seek the assistance of the Texas Hospital |
---|
30 | | - | Association, the Texas Medical Association, the Texas Nurses |
---|
31 | | - | Association, The University of Texas System Virtual Health Network, |
---|
32 | | - | teaching hospitals, and the statewide health coordinating council; |
---|
33 | | - | and |
---|
34 | | - | (3) consult with health care providers, advocacy |
---|
| 25 | + | (1) seek the assistance of the Texas Hospital |
---|
| 26 | + | Association, the Texas Medical Association, teaching hospitals, |
---|
| 27 | + | and the statewide health coordinating council; and |
---|
| 28 | + | (2) consult with health care providers, advocacy |
---|
35 | 29 | | groups, relevant federal agencies, and any other interested persons |
---|
36 | 30 | | the commission considers necessary to develop the action plan |
---|
37 | 31 | | required by this section. |
---|
38 | 32 | | (c) The action plan developed under Subsection (a) must |
---|
39 | 33 | | include: |
---|
40 | 34 | | (1) short-term and long-term plan recommendations, |
---|
41 | 35 | | including policy initiatives and reforms necessary to implement the |
---|
42 | 36 | | plan; |
---|
43 | 37 | | (2) statutory and administrative reforms necessary to |
---|
44 | 38 | | implement the plan; and |
---|
45 | 39 | | (3) options for the funding necessary to implement the |
---|
46 | 40 | | plan. |
---|
47 | 41 | | (d) The commission shall: |
---|
48 | 42 | | (1) not later than September 1, 2021: |
---|
49 | 43 | | (A) submit to the governor and the legislature |
---|
50 | 44 | | the recommendations, the statutory and administrative reforms, and |
---|
51 | 45 | | the funding options described in Subsection (c) and short-term and |
---|
52 | 46 | | long-term plans to implement those recommendations, reforms, and |
---|
53 | 47 | | options; and |
---|
54 | 48 | | (B) begin implementing the short-term plan; |
---|
55 | 49 | | (2) not later than September 1, 2023, fully implement |
---|
56 | 50 | | the short-term plan; |
---|
57 | 51 | | (3) not later than September 1, 2029, fully implement |
---|
58 | 52 | | the long-term plan; and |
---|
59 | 53 | | (4) include the short-term and long-term plans in the |
---|
60 | 54 | | update of the strategic plan for health and human services under |
---|
63 | | - | SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
64 | | - | amended by adding Section 531.02166 to read as follows: |
---|
65 | | - | Sec. 531.02166. INTERPROFESSIONAL INTERNET CONSULTATIONS |
---|
66 | | - | PILOT PROGRAM. (a) Not later than September 1, 2021, and subject |
---|
67 | | - | to Subsection (e), the commission shall develop and implement a |
---|
68 | | - | pilot program through which the commission provides or contracts |
---|
69 | | - | with a third party to provide technical assistance to train |
---|
70 | | - | Medicaid providers regarding the use of interprofessional Internet |
---|
71 | | - | consultations for Medicaid recipients in rural and medically |
---|
72 | | - | underserved areas. The program must be designed to determine |
---|
73 | | - | whether the use of technology improves access to specialty care, |
---|
74 | | - | including pediatric, prenatal, postnatal, and behavioral health |
---|
75 | | - | services, for Medicaid recipients. |
---|
76 | | - | (b) The commission shall: |
---|
77 | | - | (1) implement the pilot program in: |
---|
78 | | - | (A) at least one: |
---|
79 | | - | (i) federally qualified health center; |
---|
80 | | - | (ii) municipal public health system; |
---|
81 | | - | (iii) clinic that is a member of a nonprofit |
---|
82 | | - | membership association that supports charitable clinics in this |
---|
83 | | - | state; and |
---|
84 | | - | (iv) rural community center; and |
---|
85 | | - | (B) a maximum of 20 health clinics; and |
---|
86 | | - | (2) ensure that a third party contracted to provide |
---|
87 | | - | technical assistance described under Subsection (a): |
---|
88 | | - | (A) has significant experience integrating |
---|
89 | | - | telehealth services, telemedicine medical services, and online |
---|
90 | | - | consultations with electronic health records; and |
---|
91 | | - | (B) has a current contract with the United States |
---|
92 | | - | Department of Health and Human Services Health Resources and |
---|
93 | | - | Services Administration as a regional telehealth resource center. |
---|
94 | | - | (c) The commission shall examine cost avoidance that |
---|
95 | | - | results from providing telemedicine medical services to Medicaid |
---|
96 | | - | recipients in rural and medically underserved communities through |
---|
97 | | - | the pilot program, including cost avoidance that results from: |
---|
98 | | - | (1) reducing recipient wait times for specialty care |
---|
99 | | - | providers; |
---|
100 | | - | (2) improving access to specialty care; |
---|
101 | | - | (3) reducing the number of recipient referrals; and |
---|
102 | | - | (4) reducing the number of miles traveled by |
---|
103 | | - | recipients for specialty care consultations. |
---|
104 | | - | (d) Not later than December 31, 2022, the commission shall |
---|
105 | | - | report to the legislature regarding the status and results of the |
---|
106 | | - | pilot program and make recommendations regarding whether to |
---|
107 | | - | continue, expand, or terminate the program. |
---|
108 | | - | (e) The commission is required to implement this section |
---|
109 | | - | only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that |
---|
110 | | - | purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money |
---|
111 | | - | specifically for that purpose, the commission may, but is not |
---|
112 | | - | required to, implement this section using other appropriations |
---|
113 | | - | available for that purpose. |
---|
114 | | - | (f) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
115 | | - | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
| 57 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|