|
06/15/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Record vote RV#818
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Postponed 4/30/19 11:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amended 1-Biedermann
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2019
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|