1 | | - | H.B. No. 1869 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Klick, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1869 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 20, 2019, sent to |
---|
| 6 | + | printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
11 | 18 | | [15] members appointed by the governor: |
---|
12 | 19 | | (1) a board-certified emergency physician, appointed |
---|
13 | 20 | | from a list of names recommended by a statewide professional |
---|
14 | 21 | | association of emergency physicians; |
---|
15 | 22 | | (2) a licensed physician who is an emergency medical |
---|
16 | 23 | | services medical director, appointed from a list of names |
---|
17 | 24 | | recommended by a statewide professional association of emergency |
---|
18 | 25 | | medical services medical directors; |
---|
19 | 26 | | (3) a registered nurse, appointed from a list of names |
---|
20 | 27 | | recommended by a statewide professional association of emergency |
---|
21 | 28 | | nurses; |
---|
22 | 29 | | (4) a fire chief for a municipality that provides |
---|
23 | 30 | | emergency medical services, appointed from a list of names |
---|
24 | 31 | | recommended by a statewide fire chiefs association; |
---|
25 | 32 | | (5) [(4)] an officer or employee of a private |
---|
26 | 33 | | provider of emergency medical services who is involved with the |
---|
27 | 34 | | development of a Texas Trauma System, appointed from a list of names |
---|
28 | 35 | | recommended by a statewide association of private providers of |
---|
29 | 36 | | emergency medical services; |
---|
30 | 37 | | (6) [(5)] a volunteer who provides emergency medical |
---|
31 | 38 | | services, appointed from a list of names recommended by a statewide |
---|
32 | 39 | | association of volunteers; |
---|
33 | 40 | | (7) [(6)] an educator in the field of emergency |
---|
34 | 41 | | medical services; |
---|
35 | 42 | | (8) [(7)] a member of an emergency medical services |
---|
36 | 43 | | air medical team or unit, appointed from a list of names recommended |
---|
37 | 44 | | by a statewide emergency medical services air medical association; |
---|
38 | 45 | | (9) [(8)] a representative of a fire department that |
---|
39 | 46 | | provides emergency medical services, appointed from a list of names |
---|
40 | 47 | | recommended by a statewide association of firefighters; |
---|
41 | 48 | | (10) [(9)] a representative of hospitals who is |
---|
42 | 49 | | affiliated with a hospital that is a designated trauma facility in |
---|
43 | 50 | | an urban community, appointed from a list of names recommended by a |
---|
44 | 51 | | statewide association of hospitals; |
---|
45 | 52 | | (11) [(10)] a representative of hospitals, who is |
---|
46 | 53 | | affiliated with a hospital that is a designated trauma facility in a |
---|
47 | 54 | | rural community, appointed from a list of names recommended by a |
---|
48 | 55 | | statewide association of hospitals; |
---|
49 | 56 | | (12) [(11)] a representative of a county provider of |
---|
50 | 57 | | emergency medical services; |
---|
51 | 58 | | (13) [(12)] one licensed physician who is a |
---|
52 | 59 | | pediatrician with trauma or emergency care expertise; |
---|
53 | 60 | | (14) [(13)] one trauma surgeon; |
---|
54 | 61 | | (15) [or] one registered nurse with trauma expertise; |
---|
55 | | - | (16) a representative of a stand-alone emergency |
---|
56 | | - | medical services agency in a municipality or taxing district, |
---|
57 | | - | appointed from a list of names recommended by a statewide |
---|
58 | | - | association representing emergency medical services agencies; |
---|
59 | | - | (17) a certified paramedic, appointed from a list of |
---|
60 | | - | names recommended by a statewide association representing |
---|
61 | | - | emergency medical services agencies or emergency medical services |
---|
62 | | - | personnel; and |
---|
63 | | - | (18) [(14)] two representatives of the general public |
---|
64 | | - | who are not qualified to serve under another subdivision of this |
---|
65 | | - | subsection. |
---|
| 62 | + | and |
---|
| 63 | + | (16) [(14)] two representatives of the general |
---|
| 64 | + | public who are not qualified to serve under another subdivision of |
---|
| 65 | + | this subsection. |
---|
71 | 71 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2019, the governor |
---|
72 | 72 | | shall appoint the members of the council as required by Section |
---|
73 | 73 | | 773.012(b)(3), Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, and |
---|
74 | 74 | | Section 773.012(b)(15), Health and Safety Code, as added by this |
---|
75 | 75 | | Act. |
---|
76 | 76 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
77 | 77 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
78 | 78 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
79 | 79 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
80 | 80 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
81 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
82 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
83 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1869 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
84 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
85 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
86 | | - | No. 1869 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, |
---|
87 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
88 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
89 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
90 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1869 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
91 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
92 | | - | 0. |
---|
93 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
94 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
95 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
96 | | - | Date |
---|
97 | | - | __________________ |
---|
98 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 81 | + | * * * * * |
---|