Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1869 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            H.B. No. 1869


 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the Governor's EMS and Trauma
 Advisory Council.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 773.012(b) and (f), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The advisory council is composed of the following 19
 [15] members appointed by the governor:
 (1)  a board-certified emergency physician, appointed
 from a list of names recommended by a statewide professional
 association of emergency physicians;
 (2)  a licensed physician who is an emergency medical
 services medical director, appointed from a list of names
 recommended by a statewide professional association of emergency
 medical services medical directors;
 (3)  a registered nurse, appointed from a list of names
 recommended by a statewide professional association of emergency
 nurses;
 (4)  a fire chief for a municipality that provides
 emergency medical services, appointed from a list of names
 recommended by a statewide fire chiefs association;
 (5)  [(4)]  an officer or employee of a private
 provider of emergency medical services who is involved with the
 development of a Texas Trauma System, appointed from a list of names
 recommended by a statewide association of private providers of
 emergency medical services;
 (6)  [(5)]  a volunteer who provides emergency medical
 services, appointed from a list of names recommended by a statewide
 association of volunteers;
 (7)  [(6)]  an educator in the field of emergency
 medical services;
 (8)  [(7)]  a member of an emergency medical services
 air medical team or unit, appointed from a list of names recommended
 by a statewide emergency medical services air medical association;
 (9)  [(8)]  a representative of a fire department that
 provides emergency medical services, appointed from a list of names
 recommended by a statewide association of firefighters;
 (10)  [(9)]  a representative of hospitals who is
 affiliated with a hospital that is a designated trauma facility in
 an urban community, appointed from a list of names recommended by a
 statewide association of hospitals;
 (11)  [(10)]  a representative of hospitals, who is
 affiliated with a hospital that is a designated trauma facility in a
 rural community, appointed from a list of names recommended by a
 statewide association of hospitals;
 (12)  [(11)]  a representative of a county provider of
 emergency medical services;
 (13)  [(12)]  one licensed physician who is a
 pediatrician with trauma or emergency care expertise;
 (14)  [(13)]  one trauma surgeon;
 (15)  [or] one registered nurse with trauma expertise;
 (16)  a representative of a stand-alone emergency
 medical services agency in a municipality or taxing district,
 appointed from a list of names recommended by a statewide
 association representing emergency medical services agencies;
 (17)  a certified paramedic, appointed from a list of
 names recommended by a statewide association representing
 emergency medical services agencies or emergency medical services
 personnel; and
 (18) [(14)]  two representatives of the general public
 who are not qualified to serve under another subdivision of this
 subsection.
 (f)  Members of the advisory council serve staggered
 six-year terms with the terms of six or seven [five] members
 expiring January 1 of each even-numbered year. A vacancy on the
 advisory council is filled in the same manner as the original
 appointment for the unexpired term.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2019, the governor
 shall appoint the members of the council as required by Section
 773.012(b)(3), Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, and
 Section 773.012(b)(15), Health and Safety Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1869 was passed by the House on May 3,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1869 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1869 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor