House | 04/10/2019 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Companion considered in lieu of SB 999 | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Postponed 4/10/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Filed |