Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Record vote RV#1177
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-Gutierrez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 2-Gutierrez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2019
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2018
|
Filed
|
|
|