Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2105 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019