Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2105 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2105
1+By: Shine, Buckley, Sheffield H.B. No. 2105
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
4+ April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Intergovernmental Relations; May 6, 2019, reported favorably by
6+ the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to the territory and board of directors of the Bell County
613 Water Control and Improvement District No. 1.
714 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
815 SECTION 1. Section 9005.001, Special District Local Laws
916 Code, is amended by adding Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows:
1017 (1-a) "Director" means a member of the board of
1118 directors of the district.
1219 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 9005, Special District
1320 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 9005.0025 to read as
1421 follows:
1522 Sec. 9005.0025. BOARD. (a) The district is governed by a
1623 board of seven elected directors. In addition to the elected board
1724 members, a nonvoting member chosen by the Fort Hood Military
1825 Reservation represents the interests of the reservation.
1926 (b) The district shall hold an election to elect the
2027 appropriate number of directors on the uniform election date in
2128 November of each even-numbered year.
2229 (c) The board shall divide the district into seven
2330 single-member director precincts that comply with the federal
2431 Voting Rights Act of 1965 (52 U.S.C. Sections 10101 and 10301 et
2532 seq.) with:
2633 (1) the precincts each containing an approximately
2734 equal number of voters; and
2835 (2) the population of the City of Killeen divided into
2936 three precincts composed only of residents of the City of Killeen.
3037 (d) The board may redraw the single-member director
3138 precincts in a manner that is reasonable and equitable:
3239 (1) after any change in the boundaries of the district
3340 or of the City of Killeen; or
3441 (2) by a resolution redrawing the director precincts
3542 adopted by a two-thirds majority of the board based on changed
3643 circumstances.
3744 SECTION 3. Sections 9005.003 and 9005.004, Special District
3845 Local Laws Code, are amended to read as follows:
3946 Sec. 9005.003. DISTRICT TERRITORY. (a) The district is
4047 composed of the territory described by Subsection (b) and Section
4148 1, Chapter 523, Acts of the 54th Legislature, Regular Session, 1955
4249 (Article 8280-189, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), as that
4350 territory may have been modified under:
4451 (1) Subchapter J, Chapter 49, Water Code;
4552 (2) Subchapter O, Chapter 51, Water Code, before
4653 September 1, 1995;
4754 (3) former Section 4A, Chapter 523, Acts of the 54th
4855 Legislature, Regular Session, 1955 (Article 8280-189, Vernon's
4956 Texas Civil Statutes); or
5057 (4) other law.
5158 (b) Effective September 1, 2019, the territory of the
5259 district includes the following areas as those areas are legally
5360 described on that date:
5461 (1) the territory inside the corporate boundaries of:
5562 (A) the City of Harker Heights;
5663 (B) the City of Copperas Cove;
5764 (C) the City of Belton; and
5865 (D) the City of Killeen;
5966 (2) the service area of the 439 Water Supply
6067 Corporation;
6168 (3) the territory of the Bell County Water Control and
6269 Improvement District No. 3; and
6370 (4) the Bell County portion of the Fort Hood Military
6471 Reservation.
6572 Sec. 9005.004. ANNEXATION OF TERRITORY. (a) The [If an
6673 election concerning the annexation of territory to the district
6774 would result in the district boundaries becoming coterminous with
6875 the boundaries of the City of Killeen, the] board[, in a separate
6976 proposition,] may submit for approval at an election the question
7077 of whether to automatically annex to [extend the boundaries of] the
7178 district [to include] territory later annexed by the City of
7279 Killeen or a political subdivision described by Section 9005.003(b)
7380 or to include territory added to the service area of the 439 Water
7481 Supply Corporation [the City of Killeen annexes] that is not
7582 already included in the district.
7683 (b) An automatic annexation authorized [Land annexed by the
7784 City of Killeen] under Subsection (a) is effective [part of the
7885 district] only after:
7986 (1) the annexed area assumes its pro rata share of all
8087 bonds, notes, or other obligations or taxes owed, contracted, or
8188 authorized by the district; and
8289 (2) that assumption is approved by a majority of the
8390 voters voting at an election held in the district territory as
8491 enlarged as a result of the annexation.
8592 SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 9005, Special District
8693 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 9005.0515 to read as
8794 follows:
8895 Sec. 9005.0515. LIMITATION OF DISTRICT POWER. In the
8996 territory of the district that coincides with the territory of the
9097 Bell County Water Control and Improvement District No. 3, the
9198 powers of the district, including the power to issue bonds and
9299 exercise eminent domain, are limited to the powers necessary to
93100 provide wholesale water service.
94101 SECTION 5. (a) The Bell County Water Control and
95102 Improvement District No. 1 shall hold the first election to elect
96103 directors as described by Section 9005.0025, Special District Local
97104 Laws Code, as added by this Act, on the uniform election date in
98105 November 2020.
99106 (b) The terms of the directors serving on the board of
100107 directors of the Bell County Water Control and Improvement District
101108 No. 1 on the effective date of this Act expire on the date the
102109 directors elected under Subsection (a) of this section have
103110 qualified. A director elected to a term that expires in May 2020
104111 serves until the director's successor has qualified after the
105112 November 2020 election.
106113 (c) At the first meeting of the board of directors of the
107114 Bell County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1 that
108115 follows the election held under Subsection (a) of this section, the
109116 directors shall draw lots to determine which four directors serve a
110117 term of four years and which three directors serve a term of two
111118 years.
112119 SECTION 6. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
113120 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
114121 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
115122 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
116123 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
117124 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
118125 Government Code.
119126 (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has
120127 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
121128 Environmental Quality.
122129 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
123130 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
124131 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
125132 representatives within the required time.
126133 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
127134 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
128135 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
129136 and accomplished.
130137 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
131- ______________________________ ______________________________
132- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
133- I certify that H.B. No. 2105 was passed by the House on April
134- 18, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 2 present, not
135- voting.
136- ______________________________
137- Chief Clerk of the House
138- I certify that H.B. No. 2105 was passed by the Senate on May
139- 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
140- ______________________________
141- Secretary of the Senate
142- APPROVED: _____________________
143- Date
144- _____________________
145- Governor
138+ * * * * *