Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 23, 2019