Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2112 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2112
1+By: Thompson of Brazoria H.B. No. 2112
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
4+ May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Transportation; May 16, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
7+ May 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2112 By: Hinojosa
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to salvage motor vehicles, including flood vehicles, and
615 nonrepairable motor vehicles.
716 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
817 SECTION 1. Section 501.091, Transportation Code, is amended
918 by adding Subdivision (4-a) to read as follows:
1019 (4-a) "Flood vehicle":
1120 (A) means a motor vehicle that was submerged in a
1221 level of water higher than a doorsill of the vehicle or had water
1322 enter the passenger, trunk, or engine compartment and:
1423 (i) water came into contact with
1524 mechanical, electrical, or computerized components of the vehicle;
1625 (ii) because of the water, the vehicle
1726 requires repair to, or replacement of, any mechanical, electrical,
1827 or computerized component to operate; and
1928 (iii) an insurance company paid a claim as a
2029 result of damage from the water; and
2130 (B) does not include a motor vehicle designed for
2231 and capable of water submersion for recreational or other purposes
2332 unless the submersion results in damage to:
2433 (i) electrical safety components; or
2534 (ii) a major component part.
2635 SECTION 2. Sections 501.097(c) and (c-1), Transportation
2736 Code, are amended to read as follows:
2837 (c) A [printed] nonrepairable vehicle title must state on
2938 its face that the motor vehicle:
3039 (1) may not:
3140 (A) be repaired, rebuilt, or reconstructed;
3241 (B) be issued a title or registered in this
3342 state;
3443 (C) be operated on a public highway, in addition
3544 to any other requirement of law; and
3645 (2) may only be used as a source for used parts or
3746 scrap metal.
3847 (c-1) The department's titling system must include a remark
3948 that clearly identifies the vehicle as a salvage motor vehicle or
4049 nonrepairable motor vehicle.
4150 SECTION 3. Section 501.1002, Transportation Code, is
4251 amended to read as follows:
4352 Sec. 501.1002. OWNER-RETAINED VEHICLES. (a) If an
4453 insurance company pays a claim on a nonrepairable motor vehicle or
4554 salvage motor vehicle and the insurance company does not acquire
4655 ownership of the motor vehicle, the insurance company shall:
4756 (1) submit to the department, before the 31st day
4857 after the date of the payment of the claim, on the form prescribed
4958 by the department, a report stating that the insurance company:
5059 (A) has paid a claim on the motor vehicle; [and]
5160 (B) has not acquired ownership of the motor
5261 vehicle; and
5362 (C) has determined that the motor vehicle is a
5463 salvage motor vehicle or a nonrepairable motor vehicle; and
5564 (2) provide notice to the owner of the motor vehicle
5665 of:
5766 (A) the report required under Subdivision (1);
5867 [and]
5968 (B) the requirements for operation or transfer of
6069 ownership of the motor vehicle under Subsection (b); and
6170 (C) the insurance company's determination that
6271 the motor vehicle is a salvage motor vehicle or a nonrepairable
6372 motor vehicle.
6473 (b) The owner of a salvage motor vehicle or nonrepairable
6574 motor vehicle may not transfer ownership of the motor vehicle by
6675 sale or otherwise unless the department has issued a salvage
6776 vehicle title, salvage record of title, nonrepairable vehicle
6877 title, or nonrepairable record of title for the motor vehicle or a
6978 comparable ownership document has been issued by another state or
7079 jurisdiction for the motor vehicle in the name of the owner.
7180 (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter,
7281 on receipt of a report required under Subsection (a) for a vehicle
7382 described by that subsection, the department shall issue for the
7483 vehicle in the name of the owner, as applicable:
7584 (1) a salvage vehicle title or a salvage record of
7685 title for a salvage motor vehicle; or
7786 (2) a nonrepairable vehicle title or a nonrepairable
7887 record of title for a nonrepairable motor vehicle.
7988 (d) The department shall collect the fee authorized under
8089 this subchapter for the issuance of a title or record of title under
8190 Subsection (c). The department shall waive the fee if the report
8291 required under Subsection (a)(1) is submitted through the
8392 department's titling system.
8493 SECTION 4. Subchapter E, Chapter 501, Transportation Code,
8594 is amended by adding Section 501.1004 to read as follows:
8695 Sec. 501.1004. FLOOD VEHICLES. (a) A salvage vehicle
8796 title, salvage record of title, nonrepairable vehicle title, or
8897 nonrepairable record of title issued by the department for a flood
8998 vehicle or any title or record of title subsequently issued by the
9099 department for a flood vehicle must bear a notation that the
91100 department considers appropriate for a flood vehicle.
92101 (b) An entity that takes possession of a flood vehicle
93102 issued ownership documents without the notation required under
94103 Subsection (a) shall:
95104 (1) submit, on a form prescribed by the department, a
96105 report to the department before the 31st day after the date the
97106 entity takes possession of the flood vehicle, unless the entity:
98107 (A) is an insurance company or salvage pool
99108 operator as defined by Section 2302.001, Occupations Code; and
100109 (B) obtains an ownership document for the vehicle
101110 that bears the notation required by Subsection (a) before the
102111 entity transfers the vehicle; and
103112 (2) if the entity is a lienholder in possession of the
104113 vehicle under Chapter 54, 59, or 70, Property Code, or Chapter 2303,
105114 Occupations Code, apply to the department for the appropriate title
106115 in accordance with Section 501.097 before offering the vehicle for
107116 public sale.
108117 SECTION 5. The following provisions are repealed:
109118 (1) Section 2302.254(c), Occupations Code; and
110119 (2) Section 501.09112, Transportation Code.
111120 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
112- ______________________________ ______________________________
113- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
114- I certify that H.B. No. 2112 was passed by the House on May 3,
115- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 3, 2 present, not
116- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
117- No. 2112 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 2,
118- 2 present, not voting.
119- ______________________________
120- Chief Clerk of the House
121- I certify that H.B. No. 2112 was passed by the Senate, with
122- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
123- 0.
124- ______________________________
125- Secretary of the Senate
126- APPROVED: __________________
127- Date
128- __________________
129- Governor
121+ * * * * *