Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019