Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2137 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2137
1+By: Burns, Herrero, Guillen H.B. No. 2137
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Flores)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
4+ April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
5+ Affairs; May 1, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
6+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 1, 2019, sent
7+ to printer.)
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2137 By: Birdwell
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to an application made by certain retired state and
614 federal officers to obtain a license to carry a handgun; waiving a
715 fee.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Section 411.199, Government Code, is amended by
1018 amending Subsections (b), (d), (f), and (g) and adding Subsections
1119 (e) and (e-1) to read as follows:
1220 (b) The person shall submit two complete sets of legible and
1321 classifiable fingerprints and a sworn statement from the head of
1422 the law enforcement agency employing the applicant. A head of a law
1523 enforcement agency may not refuse to issue a statement under this
1624 subsection. If the applicant alleges that the statement is untrue,
1725 the department shall investigate the validity of the statement.
1826 The statement must include:
1927 (1) the name and rank of the applicant;
2028 (2) the status of the applicant before retirement;
2129 (3) whether or not the applicant was accused of
2230 misconduct at the time of the retirement;
2331 (4) the physical and mental condition of the
2432 applicant;
2533 (5) the type of weapons the applicant had demonstrated
2634 proficiency with during the last year of employment;
2735 (6) whether the applicant would be eligible for
2836 reemployment with the agency, and if not, the reasons the applicant
2937 is not eligible; [and]
3038 (7) a recommendation from the agency head regarding
3139 the issuance of a license under this subchapter; and
3240 (8) whether the applicant holds a current certificate
3341 of proficiency under Section 1701.357, Occupations Code.
3442 (d) The department shall waive any fee required [An
3543 applicant under this section must pay a fee of $25] for a license
3644 issued under this subchapter to an applicant under this section.
3745 (e) An applicant under this section who complies with
3846 Subsections (b) and (c) or Subsection (g), as applicable, and with
3947 the other requirements of this subchapter is not required to
4048 complete the classroom instruction portion of the handgun
4149 proficiency course described by Section 411.188 to obtain a license
4250 under this subchapter.
4351 (e-1) An applicant described by Subsection (e) who holds a
4452 current certificate of proficiency under Section 1701.357,
4553 Occupations Code, is not required to complete the range instruction
4654 portion of the handgun proficiency course described by Section
4755 411.188 to obtain a license under this subchapter.
4856 (f) A license issued under this subchapter to an applicant
4957 under this section expires as provided by Section 411.183.
5058 (g) A retired officer of the United States who was eligible
5159 to carry a firearm in the discharge of the officer's official duties
5260 is eligible to apply under this section for a license issued under
5361 this subchapter [section]. An applicant described by this
5462 subsection may submit the application at any time after retirement.
5563 The applicant shall submit with the application proper proof of
5664 retired status by presenting the following documents prepared by
5765 the agency from which the applicant retired:
5866 (1) retirement credentials; and
5967 (2) a letter from the agency head stating the
6068 applicant retired in good standing.
6169 SECTION 2. Section 411.199, Government Code, as amended by
6270 this Act, applies only to an application for a license to carry a
6371 handgun submitted on or after the effective date of this Act. An
6472 application submitted before the effective date of this Act is
6573 governed by the law in effect on the date the application was
6674 submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that
6775 purpose.
6876 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
69- ______________________________ ______________________________
70- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
71- I certify that H.B. No. 2137 was passed by the House on April
72- 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 1, 3 present, not
73- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
74- No. 2137 on May 13, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 1,
75- 1 present, not voting.
76- ______________________________
77- Chief Clerk of the House
78- I certify that H.B. No. 2137 was passed by the Senate, with
79- amendments, on May 8, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
80- ______________________________
81- Secretary of the Senate
82- APPROVED: __________________
83- Date
84- __________________
85- Governor
77+ * * * * *