Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2210 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 12, 2019