Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2210 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2210
1+By: Bell of Kaufman, et al. H.B. No. 2210
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Powell)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019;
4+ May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Education; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
6+ Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to the consideration for public school accountability
6- purposes of certain students who reside in a state hospital and
7- receive educational services provided by a school district.
13+ purposes of certain students receiving residential services in
14+ state hospitals.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
1017 amended by adding Section 39.0552 to read as follows:
11- Sec. 39.0552. MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN SCHOOL
12- DISTRICT AND STATE HOSPITAL FOR ACCOUNTABILITY PURPOSES. A
13- memorandum of understanding between a school district and a state
14- hospital under which the district provides educational services to
15- a student who resides in the state hospital must provide that the
16- school district include the performance of the student on an
17- assessment instrument or other achievement indicator adopted under
18- Section 39.053 or a reporting indicator adopted under Section
19- 39.301 in determining the performance of that school district.
20- SECTION 2. This Act applies to a memorandum of
21- understanding entered into between a school district
22- and a state
23- hospital before, on, or after the effective date of this Act. A
24- memorandum of understanding entered into before the effective date
25- of this Act must be amended as soon as practicable after the
26- effective date of this Act.
27- SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
18+ Sec. 39.0552. CERTAIN STUDENTS RECEIVING RESIDENTIAL
19+ SERVICES IN STATE HOSPITALS NOT CONSIDERED FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
20+ PURPOSES. Notwithstanding any other provision of this code, in
21+ determining the performance of a school district or campus under
22+ this chapter, a student receiving residential services in a state
23+ hospital is not considered a student of the school district or
24+ campus in which the state hospital is physically located.
25+ SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
2826 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
2927 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
3028 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
3129 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
32- ______________________________ ______________________________
33- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
34- I certify that H.B. No. 2210 was passed by the House on May 8,
35- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
36- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
37- No. 2210 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 2,
38- 3 present, not voting.
39- ______________________________
40- Chief Clerk of the House
41- I certify that H.B. No. 2210 was passed by the Senate, with
42- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
43- 0.
44- ______________________________
45- Secretary of the Senate
46- APPROVED: __________________
47- Date
48- __________________
49- Governor
30+ * * * * *