Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2218 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019