1 | | - | H.B. No. 2218 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2218 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water & |
---|
| 4 | + | Rural Affairs; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2218 By: Creighton |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to creating a Class C menhaden boat license; imposing a |
---|
6 | 14 | | fee; requiring a license. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 47.008, Parks and Wildlife Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended by amending Subsections (a) and (d) and adding Subsection |
---|
10 | 18 | | (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (a) A boat may not be used for the purpose of catching, |
---|
12 | 20 | | storing, and transporting menhaden in tidal water unless the owner |
---|
13 | 21 | | of the boat has acquired: |
---|
14 | 22 | | (1) a Class A menhaden boat license; or |
---|
15 | 23 | | (2) a Class C menhaden boat license. |
---|
16 | 24 | | (a-1) The holder of a Class C menhaden boat license may not |
---|
17 | 25 | | take or harvest from the public water of the state more than 300 |
---|
18 | 26 | | pounds a day of menhaden or an amount set by the department. |
---|
19 | 27 | | (d) The commission shall set the license fee for each [Class |
---|
20 | 28 | | B] menhaden boat for each yearly period: |
---|
21 | 29 | | (1) in an amount not less than $2,000 for a Class A |
---|
22 | 30 | | menhaden boat license; |
---|
23 | 31 | | (2) in an amount not to exceed $50 for a Class B |
---|
24 | 32 | | menhaden boat license; and |
---|
25 | 33 | | (3) at $420 for a Class C menhaden boat license. |
---|
26 | 34 | | SECTION 2. Section 47.038, Parks and Wildlife Code, is |
---|
27 | 35 | | amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to |
---|
28 | 36 | | read as follows: |
---|
29 | 37 | | (a) Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), nets [Nets] or |
---|
30 | 38 | | purse seines used for catching menhaden may not be: |
---|
31 | 39 | | (1) less than one and one-half inch stretched mesh, |
---|
32 | 40 | | excluding the bag; |
---|
33 | 41 | | (2) used in any bay, river, pass, or tributary, nor |
---|
34 | 42 | | within one mile of any barrier, jetty, island, or pass, nor within |
---|
35 | 43 | | one-half mile offshore in the Gulf of Mexico; or |
---|
36 | 44 | | (3) used for the purpose of taking edible aquatic |
---|
37 | 45 | | products for the purpose of barter, sale, or exchange. |
---|
38 | 46 | | (a-1) The holder of a Class C menhaden boat license issued |
---|
39 | 47 | | under Section 47.008 may use a cast net, as defined by the |
---|
40 | 48 | | commission, to catch menhaden in any coastal bay, river, or |
---|
41 | 49 | | tributary landward from the shoreline of the state along the coast |
---|
42 | 50 | | of the Gulf of Mexico. |
---|
43 | 51 | | SECTION 3. Section 47.008(c), Parks and Wildlife Code, is |
---|
44 | 52 | | repealed. |
---|
45 | 53 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
48 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2218 was passed by the House on April |
---|
49 | | - | 12, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 1, 2 present, not |
---|
50 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
51 | | - | No. 2218 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 3, |
---|
52 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
55 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2218 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
56 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
57 | | - | 0. |
---|
58 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
60 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Date |
---|
62 | | - | __________________ |
---|
63 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 54 | + | * * * * * |
---|