Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2235 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2019

                    By: Thompson of Harris, Longoria H.B. No. 2235
 (Senate Sponsor - Perry)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the amount credited in a state fiscal year to the
 judicial fund to provide basic civil legal services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 402.007(d), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  The total amount credited to the judicial fund for
 programs approved by the supreme court that provide basic civil
 legal services to the indigent under Subsection (b) may not exceed
 $50 million per state fiscal year [biennium].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *