Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019