Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2236 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/22/2019

                            86R11261 MTB-D
 By: Perez H.B. No. 2236


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an appropriation of money from the economic
 stabilization fund for the repair, restoration, and permanent dry
 berthing of the Battleship "Texas."
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The amount of $15,000,000 is appropriated
 from the economic stabilization fund to the Parks and Wildlife
 Department for the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2020, and
 $15,000,000 is appropriated from the economic stabilization fund to
 the Parks and Wildlife Department for the state fiscal year ending
 August 31, 2021. Money appropriated to the Parks and Wildlife
 Department under this section shall be used to repair, restore, and
 present to the public in a permanent dry berth the Battleship
 "Texas."
 (b)  This Act expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019, only if
 it receives a vote of two-thirds of the members present in each
 house of the legislature, as provided by Section 49-g(m), Article
 III, Texas Constitution.