Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2320 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2320
1+By: Paul, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2320
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Business & Commerce; May 10, 2019, reported favorably by the
5+ following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to services provided during and following a disaster.
612 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
713 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
814 amended by adding Sections 418.054, 418.055, and 418.056 to read as
915 follows:
1016 Sec. 418.054. COMMUNICATIONS IMMEDIATELY FOLLOWING A
1117 DISASTER. The division, in collaboration with other appropriate
1218 entities selected by the division, shall to the extent practicable
1319 include private wireless communication, Internet, and cable
1420 service providers in the disaster planning process and determine
1521 the availability of the providers' portable satellite
1622 communications equipment and portable mobile telephone towers to
1723 assist in response and recovery immediately following disasters.
1824 Sec. 418.055. HARDENING OF UTILITY FACILITIES AND CRITICAL
1925 INFRASTRUCTURE. (a) In this section, "critical infrastructure"
2026 includes hospitals and fire stations.
2127 (b) The division shall identify methods for hardening
2228 utility facilities and critical infrastructure in order to maintain
2329 operations of essential services during disasters.
2430 (c) The division shall, in collaboration with the Texas
2531 Commission on Environmental Quality, the Railroad Commission of
2632 Texas, and any other state agencies selected by the division:
2733 (1) determine methods for effectively reducing risks
2834 and impacts on utility facilities and critical infrastructure from
2935 a disaster; and
3036 (2) encourage public and private entities that are
3137 responsible for utility facilities and critical infrastructure to
3238 implement the methods determined under Subdivision (1).
3339 (d) This section does not apply to a utility facility owned
3440 or controlled by a utility regulated by the Public Utility
3541 Commission of Texas.
3642 Sec. 418.056. REPORT ON BUILDING TRADE SERVICES FOLLOWING
3743 DISASTERS. (a) Not later than November 1, 2020, the division shall
3844 submit a report to members of the legislature on improving the
3945 oversight, accountability, and availability of building trade
4046 services following disasters. The report must include:
4147 (1) strategies to increase the availability of
4248 tradespeople, including plumbers and electricians, following a
4349 disaster;
4450 (2) approaches to increase prosecutions of alleged
4551 fraud related to building trade services offered following a
4652 disaster; and
4753 (3) methods to encourage performance bond
4854 requirements in contracts for building trade services to be
4955 performed following a disaster.
5056 (b) The division shall consult with the Texas Department of
5157 Licensing and Regulation and any other state agencies selected by
5258 the division, local governments, trade associations, and law
5359 enforcement groups in preparing the report described by Subsection
5460 (a).
5561 (c) This section expires January 1, 2021.
5662 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 17, Utilities Code, is
5763 amended by adding Section 17.010 to read as follows:
5864 Sec. 17.010. DISASTER BILLING AWARENESS. The commission in
5965 cooperation with the Texas Division of Emergency Management shall:
6066 (1) promote public awareness of bill payment
6167 assistance available during a disaster for electric, water, and
6268 wastewater services, including assistance for consumers on level
6369 billing plans; and
6470 (2) provide the public with information about billing
6571 practices during a disaster to ensure that consumers of electric,
6672 water, and wastewater services have an adequate understanding of
6773 their rights.
6874 SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2019, the Texas
6975 Division of Emergency Management and the Public Utility Commission
7076 of Texas shall begin the public awareness campaign required by
7177 Section 17.010, Utilities Code, as added by this Act.
7278 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
73- ______________________________ ______________________________
74- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
75- I certify that H.B. No. 2320 was passed by the House on April
76- 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not
77- voting.
78- ______________________________
79- Chief Clerk of the House
80- I certify that H.B. No. 2320 was passed by the Senate on May
81- 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
82- ______________________________
83- Secretary of the Senate
84- APPROVED: _____________________
85- Date
86- _____________________
87- Governor
79+ * * * * *