Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2320 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/16/2019

                            H.B. No. 2320


 AN ACT
 relating to services provided during and following a disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 418.054, 418.055, and 418.056 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 418.054.  COMMUNICATIONS IMMEDIATELY FOLLOWING A
 DISASTER. The division, in collaboration with other appropriate
 entities selected by the division, shall to the extent practicable
 include private wireless communication, Internet, and cable
 service providers in the disaster planning process and determine
 the availability of the providers' portable satellite
 communications equipment and portable mobile telephone towers to
 assist in response and recovery immediately following disasters.
 Sec. 418.055.  HARDENING OF UTILITY FACILITIES AND CRITICAL
 INFRASTRUCTURE. (a) In this section, "critical infrastructure"
 includes hospitals and fire stations.
 (b)  The division shall identify methods for hardening
 utility facilities and critical infrastructure in order to maintain
 operations of essential services during disasters.
 (c)  The division shall, in collaboration with the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality, the Railroad Commission of
 Texas, and any other state agencies selected by the division:
 (1)  determine methods for effectively reducing risks
 and impacts on utility facilities and critical infrastructure from
 a disaster; and
 (2)  encourage public and private entities that are
 responsible for utility facilities and critical infrastructure to
 implement the methods determined under Subdivision (1).
 (d)  This section does not apply to a utility facility owned
 or controlled by a utility regulated by the Public Utility
 Commission of Texas.
 Sec. 418.056.  REPORT ON BUILDING TRADE SERVICES FOLLOWING
 DISASTERS. (a) Not later than November 1, 2020, the division shall
 submit a report to members of the legislature on improving the
 oversight, accountability, and availability of building trade
 services following disasters. The report must include:
 (1)  strategies to increase the availability of
 tradespeople, including plumbers and electricians, following a
 disaster;
 (2)  approaches to increase prosecutions of alleged
 fraud related to building trade services offered following a
 disaster; and
 (3)  methods to encourage performance bond
 requirements in contracts for building trade services to be
 performed following a disaster.
 (b)  The division shall consult with the Texas Department of
 Licensing and Regulation and any other state agencies selected by
 the division, local governments, trade associations, and law
 enforcement groups in preparing the report described by Subsection
 (a).
 (c)  This section expires January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 17, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 17.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 17.010.  DISASTER BILLING AWARENESS. The commission in
 cooperation with the Texas Division of Emergency Management shall:
 (1)  promote public awareness of bill payment
 assistance available during a disaster for electric, water, and
 wastewater services, including assistance for consumers on level
 billing plans; and
 (2)  provide the public with information about billing
 practices during a disaster to ensure that consumers of electric,
 water, and wastewater services have an adequate understanding of
 their rights.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2019, the Texas
 Division of Emergency Management and the Public Utility Commission
 of Texas shall begin the public awareness campaign required by
 Section 17.010, Utilities Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2320 was passed by the House on April
 11, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2320 was passed by the Senate on May
 15, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED:  _____________________
 Date
 _____________________
 Governor