Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2340 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2340
1+By: Dominguez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Johnson) H.B. No. 2340
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
4+ Rural Affairs; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to emergency and disaster management, response, and
612 recovery.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 418.002, Government Code, is amended to
915 read as follows:
1016 Sec. 418.002. PURPOSES. The purposes of this chapter are
1117 to:
1218 (1) reduce vulnerability of people and communities of
1319 this state to damage, injury, and loss of life and property
1420 resulting from natural or man-made catastrophes, riots, or hostile
1521 military or paramilitary action;
1622 (2) prepare for prompt and efficient rescue, care, and
1723 treatment of persons victimized or threatened by disaster;
1824 (3) provide a setting conducive to the rapid and
1925 orderly restoration and rehabilitation of persons and property
2026 affected by disasters;
2127 (4) clarify and strengthen the roles of the governor,
2228 state agencies, the judicial branch of state government, and local
2329 governments in prevention of, preparation for, response to, and
2430 recovery from disasters;
2531 (5) authorize and provide for cooperation in disaster
2632 mitigation, preparedness, response, and recovery;
2733 (6) authorize and provide for coordination of
2834 activities relating to disaster mitigation, preparedness,
2935 response, and recovery by agencies and officers of this state, and
3036 similar state-local, interstate, federal-state, and foreign
3137 activities in which the state and its political subdivisions may
3238 participate;
3339 (7) provide an emergency management system embodying
3440 all aspects of predisaster preparedness and postdisaster response;
3541 (8) assist in mitigation of disasters caused or
3642 aggravated by inadequate planning for and regulation of public and
3743 private facilities and land use; [and]
3844 (9) encourage state agencies, local governments,
3945 nongovernmental organizations, private entities, and individuals
4046 to adopt the goals of the strategic plan of the Federal Emergency
4147 Management Agency for preparing for, responding to, and recovering
4248 from a disaster that emphasize cooperation among federal agencies,
4349 state agencies, local governments, nongovernmental organizations,
4450 private entities, and individuals in each activity or project
4551 undertaken to ensure that this state is prepared to effectively
4652 respond to and recover from a disaster; and
4753 (10) provide the authority and mechanism to respond to
4854 an energy emergency.
4955 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
5056 amended by adding Sections 418.054 and 418.055 to read as follows:
5157 Sec. 418.054. UNMANNED AIRCRAFT STUDY GROUP. (a) In this
5258 section, "study group" means the unmanned aircraft study group
5359 established under this section.
5460 (b) The unmanned aircraft study group is established and
5561 consists of the following members appointed by the chief of the
5662 division:
5763 (1) representatives of the division;
5864 (2) representatives from institutions of higher
5965 education; and
6066 (3) other appropriate interested persons.
6167 (c) The study group shall study issues related to the
6268 appropriate use of unmanned aircraft in responding to and
6369 recovering from a disaster, including:
6470 (1) strategies for coordinating and promoting the use
6571 of unmanned aircraft among state agencies, local governments, and
6672 private entities in the response and recovery; and
6773 (2) recommended changes to state law that would allow
6874 state agencies, local governments, and private entities to more
6975 effectively use unmanned aircraft in the response and recovery.
7076 (d) Not later than November 1, 2020, the study group shall
7177 submit a report containing recommendations on the issues described
7278 by Subsection (c) to each member of the legislature.
7379 (e) The study group is abolished and this section expires
7480 January 1, 2021.
7581 Sec. 418.055. INFORMATION SHARING WORK GROUP. (a) In this
7682 section, "work group" means the work group established under this
7783 section.
7884 (b) The division shall establish a work group of state
7985 agencies involved in disaster management. The work group consists
8086 of members appointed by the chief of the division who represent:
8187 (1) the comptroller's office;
8288 (2) the Department of State Health Services;
8389 (3) the Texas Department of Transportation;
8490 (4) the General Land Office;
8591 (5) the Health and Human Services Commission;
8692 (6) institutions of higher education; and
8793 (7) to the extent practicable, appropriate federal
8894 agencies.
8995 (c) The work group shall develop recommendations for
9096 improving the manner in which electronic information is stored by
9197 and shared among state agencies and between state agencies and
9298 federal agencies to improve the capacity of the agencies to:
9399 (1) respond to a disaster; and
94100 (2) coordinate the agencies' responses to a disaster.
95101 (d) Not later than November 1 of each even-numbered year,
96102 the work group shall submit the group's recommendations to the
97103 governor.
98104 SECTION 3. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
99105 amended by adding Section 418.056 to read as follows:
100106 Sec. 418.056. PERMITTING TASK FORCE. (a) The division
101107 shall form a task force with representatives from the General Land
102108 Office, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, Parks and
103109 Wildlife Department, Texas Water Development Board, Texas A&M
104110 AgriLife Extension Service, Department of State Health Services,
105111 Public Utility Commission of Texas, and Texas Historical Commission
106112 to be activated if a state of disaster is declared under Section
107113 418.014 because of weather conditions to expedite:
108114 (1) environmental permitting; and
109115 (2) access to funds from federal disaster relief
110116 programs following the disaster.
111117 (b) The task force formed under this section shall develop
112118 recommendations for expediting the evaluation of environmental
113119 permits during disaster recovery in order for local entities to
114120 demonstrate compliance with regulations and access federal
115121 disaster relief programs and funding.
116122 (c) In performing its duties under this section, the task
117123 force may use resources of agencies participating in the task
118124 force.
119125 SECTION 4. Subchapter A, Chapter 751, Government Code, is
120126 amended by adding Section 751.017 to read as follows:
121127 Sec. 751.017. FEDERAL LEGISLATIVE AND POLICY
122128 RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DISASTER ASSISTANCE. (a) The office, in
123129 consultation with the Texas Division of Emergency Management, and,
124130 as practicable, federal agencies and members of Congress, shall:
125131 (1) study federal laws and policies related to issues
126132 affecting the ability of federal agencies, state agencies, and
127133 local governments to cooperate in responding to a disaster,
128134 including issues related to procurement, housing assistance,
129135 information sharing, personnel, and federal disaster assistance
130136 programs; and
131137 (2) make recommendations to improve federal laws and
132138 policies related to the issues described by Subdivision (1).
133139 (b) Not later than November 1, 2020, the office shall
134140 deliver to the board a report of the recommendations described by
135141 Subsection (a)(2).
136142 (c) This section expires January 1, 2021.
137143 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
138- ______________________________ ______________________________
139- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
140- I certify that H.B. No. 2340 was passed by the House on April
141- 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 1, 2 present, not
142- voting.
143- ______________________________
144- Chief Clerk of the House
145- I certify that H.B. No. 2340 was passed by the Senate on May
146- 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
147- ______________________________
148- Secretary of the Senate
149- APPROVED: _____________________
150- Date
151- _____________________
152- Governor
144+ * * * * *