H.B. No. 2340 AN ACT relating to emergency and disaster management, response, and recovery. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 418.002, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 418.002. PURPOSES. The purposes of this chapter are to: (1) reduce vulnerability of people and communities of this state to damage, injury, and loss of life and property resulting from natural or man-made catastrophes, riots, or hostile military or paramilitary action; (2) prepare for prompt and efficient rescue, care, and treatment of persons victimized or threatened by disaster; (3) provide a setting conducive to the rapid and orderly restoration and rehabilitation of persons and property affected by disasters; (4) clarify and strengthen the roles of the governor, state agencies, the judicial branch of state government, and local governments in prevention of, preparation for, response to, and recovery from disasters; (5) authorize and provide for cooperation in disaster mitigation, preparedness, response, and recovery; (6) authorize and provide for coordination of activities relating to disaster mitigation, preparedness, response, and recovery by agencies and officers of this state, and similar state-local, interstate, federal-state, and foreign activities in which the state and its political subdivisions may participate; (7) provide an emergency management system embodying all aspects of predisaster preparedness and postdisaster response; (8) assist in mitigation of disasters caused or aggravated by inadequate planning for and regulation of public and private facilities and land use; [and] (9) encourage state agencies, local governments, nongovernmental organizations, private entities, and individuals to adopt the goals of the strategic plan of the Federal Emergency Management Agency for preparing for, responding to, and recovering from a disaster that emphasize cooperation among federal agencies, state agencies, local governments, nongovernmental organizations, private entities, and individuals in each activity or project undertaken to ensure that this state is prepared to effectively respond to and recover from a disaster; and (10) provide the authority and mechanism to respond to an energy emergency. SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by adding Sections 418.054 and 418.055 to read as follows: Sec. 418.054. UNMANNED AIRCRAFT STUDY GROUP. (a) In this section, "study group" means the unmanned aircraft study group established under this section. (b) The unmanned aircraft study group is established and consists of the following members appointed by the chief of the division: (1) representatives of the division; (2) representatives from institutions of higher education; and (3) other appropriate interested persons. (c) The study group shall study issues related to the appropriate use of unmanned aircraft in responding to and recovering from a disaster, including: (1) strategies for coordinating and promoting the use of unmanned aircraft among state agencies, local governments, and private entities in the response and recovery; and (2) recommended changes to state law that would allow state agencies, local governments, and private entities to more effectively use unmanned aircraft in the response and recovery. (d) Not later than November 1, 2020, the study group shall submit a report containing recommendations on the issues described by Subsection (c) to each member of the legislature. (e) The study group is abolished and this section expires January 1, 2021. Sec. 418.055. INFORMATION SHARING WORK GROUP. (a) In this section, "work group" means the work group established under this section. (b) The division shall establish a work group of state agencies involved in disaster management. The work group consists of members appointed by the chief of the division who represent: (1) the comptroller's office; (2) the Department of State Health Services; (3) the Texas Department of Transportation; (4) the General Land Office; (5) the Health and Human Services Commission; (6) institutions of higher education; and (7) to the extent practicable, appropriate federal agencies. (c) The work group shall develop recommendations for improving the manner in which electronic information is stored by and shared among state agencies and between state agencies and federal agencies to improve the capacity of the agencies to: (1) respond to a disaster; and (2) coordinate the agencies' responses to a disaster. (d) Not later than November 1 of each even-numbered year, the work group shall submit the group's recommendations to the governor. SECTION 3. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 418.056 to read as follows: Sec. 418.056. PERMITTING TASK FORCE. (a) The division shall form a task force with representatives from the General Land Office, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, Parks and Wildlife Department, Texas Water Development Board, Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service, Department of State Health Services, Public Utility Commission of Texas, and Texas Historical Commission to be activated if a state of disaster is declared under Section 418.014 because of weather conditions to expedite: (1) environmental permitting; and (2) access to funds from federal disaster relief programs following the disaster. (b) The task force formed under this section shall develop recommendations for expediting the evaluation of environmental permits during disaster recovery in order for local entities to demonstrate compliance with regulations and access federal disaster relief programs and funding. (c) In performing its duties under this section, the task force may use resources of agencies participating in the task force. SECTION 4. Subchapter A, Chapter 751, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 751.017 to read as follows: Sec. 751.017. FEDERAL LEGISLATIVE AND POLICY RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DISASTER ASSISTANCE. (a) The office, in consultation with the Texas Division of Emergency Management, and, as practicable, federal agencies and members of Congress, shall: (1) study federal laws and policies related to issues affecting the ability of federal agencies, state agencies, and local governments to cooperate in responding to a disaster, including issues related to procurement, housing assistance, information sharing, personnel, and federal disaster assistance programs; and (2) make recommendations to improve federal laws and policies related to the issues described by Subdivision (1). (b) Not later than November 1, 2020, the office shall deliver to the board a report of the recommendations described by Subsection (a)(2). (c) This section expires January 1, 2021. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2340 was passed by the House on April 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2340 was passed by the Senate on May 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor