Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB253 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2019
Bill March 22, 2019