Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB253 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 253
1+By: Farrar, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 253
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
3+ April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4+ Human Services; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to a strategic plan to address postpartum depression.
612 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
713 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Health and Safety
814 Code, is amended by adding Section 32.046 to read as follows:
915 Sec. 32.046. POSTPARTUM DEPRESSION STRATEGIC PLAN. (a)
1016 The commission shall develop and implement a five-year strategic
1117 plan to improve access to postpartum depression screening,
1218 referral, treatment, and support services. Not later than
1319 September 1 of the last fiscal year in each five-year period, the
1420 commission shall develop a new strategic plan for the next five
1521 fiscal years beginning with the following fiscal year.
1622 (b) The strategic plan must provide strategies to:
1723 (1) increase awareness among state-administered
1824 program providers who may serve women who are at risk of or are
1925 experiencing postpartum depression about the prevalence and
2026 effects of postpartum depression on outcomes for women and
2127 children;
2228 (2) establish a referral network of community-based
2329 mental health providers and support services addressing postpartum
2430 depression;
2531 (3) increase women's access to formal and informal
2632 peer support services, including access to certified peer
2733 specialists who have received additional training related to
2834 postpartum depression;
2935 (4) raise public awareness of and reduce the stigma
3036 related to postpartum depression; and
3137 (5) leverage sources of funding to support existing
3238 community-based postpartum depression screening, referral,
3339 treatment, and support services.
3440 (c) The commission shall coordinate with the department,
3541 the statewide health coordinating council, the office of mental
3642 health coordination, and the statewide behavioral health
3743 coordinating council in developing the strategic plan.
3844 (d) The commission, in consultation with the department,
3945 the statewide health coordinating council, the office of mental
4046 health coordination, and the statewide behavioral health
4147 coordinating council, shall annually review and update, as
4248 necessary, the strategic plan.
4349 (e) For purposes of this section, "postpartum depression"
4450 means a disorder in which a woman experiences moderate to severe
4551 depression following a pregnancy, regardless of whether the
4652 pregnancy resulted in birth, or an act defined by Section
4753 245.002(1).
4854 SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2020, the Health and
4955 Human Services Commission shall develop the initial strategic plan
5056 required by Section 32.046, Health and Safety Code, as added by this
5157 Act.
5258 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5359 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5460 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5561 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5662 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
57- ______________________________ ______________________________
58- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
59- I certify that H.B. No. 253 was passed by the House on April
60- 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 89, Nays 55, 1 present, not
61- voting.
62- ______________________________
63- Chief Clerk of the House
64- I certify that H.B. No. 253 was passed by the Senate on May
65- 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
66- ______________________________
67- Secretary of the Senate
68- APPROVED: _____________________
69- Date
70- _____________________
71- Governor
63+ * * * * *