Senate | 05/15/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/07/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Record vote RV#1067 | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Amended 1-E. Thompson | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Filed |