1 | | - | H.B. No. 26 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Metcalf, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 26 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water & |
---|
| 4 | + | Rural Affairs; May 16, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 16, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 26 By: Johnson |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the notification of affected persons of certain |
---|
6 | 14 | | releases of water from certain dams. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 12.052, Water Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 17 | | amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), (a-3), |
---|
10 | 18 | | and (a-4) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (a) The commission shall make and enforce rules and orders |
---|
12 | 20 | | and shall perform all other acts necessary to provide for the safe |
---|
13 | 21 | | construction, operation, maintenance, repair, [and] removal, and |
---|
14 | 22 | | emergency management of dams located in this state. In performing |
---|
15 | 23 | | the commission's duties under this subsection, the commission shall |
---|
16 | 24 | | identify and focus on the most hazardous dams in the state. |
---|
17 | 25 | | (a-1) The commission shall require the owner or operator of |
---|
18 | 26 | | a state-regulated dam that has a spillway with gates used to |
---|
19 | 27 | | regulate flood waters to notify local emergency operation centers |
---|
20 | 28 | | in downstream communities when spillway releases are made to |
---|
21 | 29 | | regulate flood waters, according to the commission's emergency |
---|
22 | 30 | | action plan guidelines. |
---|
23 | 31 | | (a-2) Emergency operation centers notified under Subsection |
---|
24 | 32 | | (a-1) shall provide notice to the public when a release may |
---|
25 | 33 | | contribute to flooding that may result in damage to life and |
---|
26 | 34 | | property through all available means and shall include, at a |
---|
27 | 35 | | minimum, the following information, if available: |
---|
28 | 36 | | (1) the names of the dam and reservoir; |
---|
29 | 37 | | (2) the communities downstream that may be impacted |
---|
30 | 38 | | and estimated time of impact; |
---|
31 | 39 | | (3) the names of affected river basins and |
---|
32 | 40 | | tributaries; |
---|
33 | 41 | | (4) the expected duration of the release; |
---|
34 | 42 | | (5) the level of potential flooding according to the |
---|
35 | 43 | | National Weather Service River Forecast Center; and |
---|
36 | 44 | | (6) the roads or bridges that are expected to be |
---|
37 | 45 | | affected. |
---|
38 | 46 | | (a-3) A notice provided under Subsection (a-2) must include |
---|
39 | 47 | | the following disclaimer: "Actual flood conditions may vary |
---|
40 | 48 | | significantly from the alert based on new or changed conditions; |
---|
41 | 49 | | advanced alerts of changed conditions may not be possible." |
---|
42 | 50 | | (a-4) Notwithstanding any other defense or immunity that |
---|
43 | 51 | | may apply, a notice provided under Subsection (a-1) or (a-2) may not |
---|
44 | 52 | | be considered an admission of liability and may not be used as |
---|
45 | 53 | | evidence in any suit related to the releases that are the subject of |
---|
46 | 54 | | the notice. |
---|
47 | 55 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas |
---|
48 | 56 | | Commission on Environmental Quality shall provide guidance for |
---|
49 | 57 | | developing a notification plan through a dam owner's emergency |
---|
50 | 58 | | action plan for state-regulated dams that have a spillway with |
---|
51 | 59 | | gates used to regulate flood waters. |
---|
52 | 60 | | (b) Not later than June 1, 2020, a dam owner or operator |
---|
53 | 61 | | shall deliver the notification plan described by Subsection (a) of |
---|
54 | 62 | | this section for each dam to the Texas Commission on Environmental |
---|
55 | 63 | | Quality. |
---|
56 | 64 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
57 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
58 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
59 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 26 was passed by the House on April |
---|
60 | | - | 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
61 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
62 | | - | No. 26 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 2 |
---|
63 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
66 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 26 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
67 | | - | amendments, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
68 | | - | 0. |
---|
69 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
71 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Date |
---|
73 | | - | __________________ |
---|
74 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 65 | + | * * * * * |
---|