Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB26 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2019

                            H.B. No. 26


 AN ACT
 relating to the notification of affected persons of certain
 releases of water from certain dams.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.052, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), (a-3),
 and (a-4) to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission shall make and enforce rules and orders
 and shall perform all other acts necessary to provide for the safe
 construction, operation, maintenance, repair, [and] removal, and
 emergency management of dams located in this state. In performing
 the commission's duties under this subsection, the commission shall
 identify and focus on the most hazardous dams in the state.
 (a-1)  The commission shall require the owner or operator of
 a state-regulated dam that has a spillway with gates used to
 regulate flood waters to notify local emergency operation centers
 in downstream communities when spillway releases are made to
 regulate flood waters, according to the commission's emergency
 action plan guidelines.
 (a-2)  Emergency operation centers notified under Subsection
 (a-1) shall provide notice to the public when a release may
 contribute to flooding that may result in damage to life and
 property through all available means and shall include, at a
 minimum, the following information, if available:
 (1)  the names of the dam and reservoir;
 (2)  the communities downstream that may be impacted
 and estimated time of impact;
 (3)  the names of affected river basins and
 tributaries;
 (4)  the expected duration of the release;
 (5)  the level of potential flooding according to the
 National Weather Service River Forecast Center; and
 (6)  the roads or bridges that are expected to be
 affected.
 (a-3)  A notice provided under Subsection (a-2) must include
 the following disclaimer:  "Actual flood conditions may vary
 significantly from the alert based on new or changed conditions;
 advanced alerts of changed conditions may not be possible."
 (a-4)  Notwithstanding any other defense or immunity that
 may apply, a notice provided under Subsection (a-1) or (a-2) may not
 be considered an admission of liability and may not be used as
 evidence in any suit related to the releases that are the subject of
 the notice.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality shall provide guidance for
 developing a notification plan through a dam owner's emergency
 action plan for state-regulated dams that have a spillway with
 gates used to regulate flood waters.
 (b)  Not later than June 1, 2020, a dam owner or operator
 shall deliver the notification plan described by Subsection (a) of
 this section for each dam to the Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 26 was passed by the House on April
 11, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 26 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 0, 2
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 26 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor