Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2617 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2019
Bill April 28, 2019