1 | | - | H.B. No. 2617 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Cole (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 2617 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Intergovernmental Relations; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by |
---|
| 5 | + | the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the fiscal year of certain political subdivisions. |
---|
6 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 140, Local Government Code, is amended |
---|
8 | 14 | | by adding Section 140.012 to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 15 | | Sec. 140.012. FISCAL YEAR OF CERTAIN POLITICAL SUBDIVISIONS |
---|
10 | 16 | | CREATED ON OR AFTER SEPTEMBER 1, 2019. (a) This section does not |
---|
11 | 17 | | apply to a political subdivision that is a special district created |
---|
12 | 18 | | under Section 52, Article III, or Section 59, Article XVI, Texas |
---|
13 | 19 | | Constitution. |
---|
14 | 20 | | (b) A political subdivision that is created on or after |
---|
15 | 21 | | September 1, 2019, and that has authority to impose a tax must have |
---|
16 | 22 | | the same fiscal year as the county in which the political |
---|
17 | 23 | | subdivision is wholly or primarily located. |
---|
18 | 24 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
19 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
20 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
21 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2617 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
22 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
23 | | - | voting. |
---|
24 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
25 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
26 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2617 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
27 | | - | 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
28 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
29 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
30 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Date |
---|
32 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
33 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 25 | + | * * * * * |
---|