1 | 1 | | 86R10207 AJZ-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Phelan H.B. No. 2622 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to surcharges assessed under the driver responsibility |
---|
8 | 8 | | program; authorizing surcharges; reducing, repealing, and waiving |
---|
9 | 9 | | surcharges. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Section 708.053, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
12 | 12 | | to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | Sec. 708.053. ANNUAL SURCHARGE FOR POINTS. Each year, the |
---|
14 | 14 | | department shall assess a surcharge on the license of a person who |
---|
15 | 15 | | has accumulated: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) three or more but fewer than six points under this |
---|
17 | 17 | | subchapter during the preceding 12-month period; or |
---|
18 | 18 | | (2) six or more points under this subchapter during |
---|
19 | 19 | | the preceding 36-month period. |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Section 708.054, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
21 | 21 | | to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | Sec. 708.054. AMOUNT OF POINTS SURCHARGE. (a) The amount |
---|
23 | 23 | | of a surcharge under this chapter is: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) $50 for accumulating three points during the |
---|
25 | 25 | | preceding 12-month period; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) $60 for accumulating four points during the |
---|
27 | 27 | | preceding 12-month period; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (3) $70 for accumulating five points during the |
---|
29 | 29 | | preceding 12-month period; or |
---|
30 | 30 | | (4) $100 for accumulating [the first] six points |
---|
31 | 31 | | during the preceding 36-month period and $25 for each additional |
---|
32 | 32 | | point in excess of six points accumulated during the preceding |
---|
33 | 33 | | 36-month period. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (b) The department shall ensure that the amount of any |
---|
35 | 35 | | surcharge assessed on a person's license under Subsection (a)(1), |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2), or (3) is credited toward the amount of a surcharge assessed on |
---|
37 | 37 | | the person's license under Subsection (a)(4) during the same |
---|
38 | 38 | | 36-month period. |
---|
39 | 39 | | SECTION 3. Section 708.103(b), Transportation Code, is |
---|
40 | 40 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) The [Except as provided by Subsection (c), the] amount |
---|
42 | 42 | | of a surcharge under this section is $50 [$250] per year. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 4. Section 708.106, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
44 | 44 | | to read as follows: |
---|
45 | 45 | | Sec. 708.106. DEFERRAL OF SURCHARGES FOR DEPLOYED MILITARY |
---|
46 | 46 | | PERSONNEL. The department by rule shall establish a deferral |
---|
47 | 47 | | program for surcharges assessed under Section 708.103 [or 708.104] |
---|
48 | 48 | | against a person who is a member of the United States armed forces |
---|
49 | 49 | | on active duty deployed outside of the continental United States. |
---|
50 | 50 | | The program must: |
---|
51 | 51 | | (1) toll the 36-month period while the person is |
---|
52 | 52 | | deployed; and |
---|
53 | 53 | | (2) defer assessment of surcharges against the person |
---|
54 | 54 | | until the date the person is no longer deployed for an offense |
---|
55 | 55 | | committed: |
---|
56 | 56 | | (A) before the person was deployed; or |
---|
57 | 57 | | (B) while the person is deployed. |
---|
58 | 58 | | SECTION 5. Section 708.159(c), Transportation Code, is |
---|
59 | 59 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
60 | 60 | | (c) If a person makes a single up-front payment under this |
---|
61 | 61 | | section in the amount specified in the notice under Subsection |
---|
62 | 62 | | (b)(1) and the person is not, in the 36-month period for which the |
---|
63 | 63 | | person made the up-front payment, subsequently convicted of an |
---|
64 | 64 | | offense requiring a surcharge or an increase in the amount due to |
---|
65 | 65 | | the department, the department is not required to: |
---|
66 | 66 | | (1) take any further action under Section 708.053, |
---|
67 | 67 | | 708.102, or 708.103, [or 708.104,] as applicable; or |
---|
68 | 68 | | (2) annually notify the person of the assessment of |
---|
69 | 69 | | the surcharge under Section 708.151. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SECTION 6. Subchapter D, Chapter 708, Transportation Code, |
---|
71 | 71 | | is amended by adding Section 708.160 to read as follows: |
---|
72 | 72 | | Sec. 708.160. WAIVER OF CERTAIN SURCHARGES. (a) The |
---|
73 | 73 | | department shall waive a surcharge assessed under this chapter on |
---|
74 | 74 | | or before September 1, 2013. |
---|
75 | 75 | | (b) This section expires September 1, 2020. |
---|
76 | 76 | | SECTION 7. Section 708.158, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
77 | 77 | | by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to |
---|
78 | 78 | | read as follows: |
---|
79 | 79 | | (a) The department shall waive all surcharges assessed |
---|
80 | 80 | | under this chapter for a person who is indigent. For the purposes |
---|
81 | 81 | | of this section, a person is considered to be indigent if: |
---|
82 | 82 | | (1) the person provides the evidence described by |
---|
83 | 83 | | Subsection (b) to the court; or |
---|
84 | 84 | | (2) the department determines that the person is |
---|
85 | 85 | | indigent. |
---|
86 | 86 | | (c) The department shall, as necessary, in collaboration |
---|
87 | 87 | | with other state agencies, obtain publicly available information to |
---|
88 | 88 | | determine whether a person is indigent for purposes of this |
---|
89 | 89 | | section. |
---|
90 | 90 | | (d) The standing committees of the senate and house of |
---|
91 | 91 | | representatives that have jurisdiction over issues related to |
---|
92 | 92 | | transportation shall jointly conduct a study of methods to improve |
---|
93 | 93 | | automatic data sharing between the department and other agencies |
---|
94 | 94 | | for the purpose of determining whether a person is indigent under |
---|
95 | 95 | | Subsection (c). Not later than December 1, 2020, the committees |
---|
96 | 96 | | shall submit a report on the findings of the study performed under |
---|
97 | 97 | | this subsection and the committees' legislative recommendations to |
---|
98 | 98 | | the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of |
---|
99 | 99 | | representatives. This subsection expires January 1, 2021. |
---|
100 | 100 | | SECTION 8. Sections 708.103(c) and 708.104, Transportation |
---|
101 | 101 | | Code, are repealed. |
---|
102 | 102 | | SECTION 9. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
103 | 103 | | an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An |
---|
104 | 104 | | offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed |
---|
105 | 105 | | by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed and the |
---|
106 | 106 | | former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of |
---|
107 | 107 | | this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of |
---|
108 | 108 | | this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date. |
---|
109 | 109 | | SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|