Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2622 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/27/2019

                            86R10207 AJZ-F
 By: Phelan H.B. No. 2622


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to surcharges assessed under the driver responsibility
 program; authorizing surcharges; reducing, repealing, and waiving
 surcharges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 708.053, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 708.053.  ANNUAL SURCHARGE FOR POINTS. Each year, the
 department shall assess a surcharge on the license of a person who
 has accumulated:
 (1)  three or more but fewer than six points under this
 subchapter during the preceding 12-month period; or
 (2)  six or more points under this subchapter during
 the preceding 36-month period.
 SECTION 2.  Section 708.054, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 708.054.  AMOUNT OF POINTS SURCHARGE. (a)  The amount
 of a surcharge under this chapter is:
 (1)  $50 for accumulating three points during the
 preceding 12-month period;
 (2)  $60 for accumulating four points during the
 preceding 12-month period;
 (3)  $70 for accumulating five points during the
 preceding 12-month period; or
 (4)  $100 for accumulating [the first] six points
 during the preceding 36-month period and $25 for each additional
 point in excess of six points accumulated during the preceding
 36-month period.
 (b)  The department shall ensure that the amount of any
 surcharge assessed on a person's license under Subsection (a)(1),
 (2), or (3) is credited toward the amount of a surcharge assessed on
 the person's license under Subsection (a)(4) during the same
 36-month period.
 SECTION 3.  Section 708.103(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The [Except as provided by Subsection (c), the] amount
 of a surcharge under this section is $50 [$250] per year.
 SECTION 4.  Section 708.106, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 708.106.  DEFERRAL OF SURCHARGES FOR DEPLOYED MILITARY
 PERSONNEL.  The department by rule shall establish a deferral
 program for surcharges assessed under Section 708.103 [or 708.104]
 against a person who is a member of the United States armed forces
 on active duty deployed outside of the continental United States.
 The program must:
 (1)  toll the 36-month period while the person is
 deployed; and
 (2)  defer assessment of surcharges against the person
 until the date the person is no longer deployed for an offense
 committed:
 (A)  before the person was deployed; or
 (B)  while the person is deployed.
 SECTION 5.  Section 708.159(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  If a person makes a single up-front payment under this
 section in the amount specified in the notice under Subsection
 (b)(1) and the person is not, in the 36-month period for which the
 person made the up-front payment, subsequently convicted of an
 offense requiring a surcharge or an increase in the amount due to
 the department, the department is not required to:
 (1)  take any further action under Section 708.053,
 708.102, or 708.103, [or 708.104,] as applicable; or
 (2)  annually notify the person of the assessment of
 the surcharge under Section 708.151.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter D, Chapter 708, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 708.160 to read as follows:
 Sec. 708.160.  WAIVER OF CERTAIN SURCHARGES. (a)  The
 department shall waive a surcharge assessed under this chapter on
 or before September 1, 2013.
 (b)  This section expires September 1, 2020.
 SECTION 7.  Section 708.158, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c) and (d) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall waive all surcharges assessed
 under this chapter for a person who is indigent.  For the purposes
 of this section, a person is considered to be indigent if:
 (1)  the person provides the evidence described by
 Subsection (b) to the court; or
 (2)  the department determines that the person is
 indigent.
 (c)  The department shall, as necessary, in collaboration
 with other state agencies, obtain publicly available information to
 determine whether a person is indigent for purposes of this
 section.
 (d)  The standing committees of the senate and house of
 representatives that have jurisdiction over issues related to
 transportation shall jointly conduct a study of methods to improve
 automatic data sharing between the department and other agencies
 for the purpose of determining whether a person is indigent under
 Subsection (c).  Not later than December 1, 2020, the committees
 shall submit a report on the findings of the study performed under
 this subsection and the committees' legislative recommendations to
 the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives.  This subsection expires January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 8.  Sections 708.103(c) and 708.104, Transportation
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 9.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.  An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.