Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2628 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2019
Bill May 6, 2019