Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2628 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2628
1+By: Vo (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2628
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019;
3+ May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
6+ May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2628 By: Hughes
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the manner of reporting and maintaining certain
614 information relating to candidates and election returns.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Sections 67.007(a), (c), and (d), Election Code,
917 are amended to read as follows:
1018 (a) For each election for a statewide, [or] district,
1119 county, or precinct office, a statewide measure, or president and
1220 vice-president of the United States, the county clerk of each
1321 county in the territory covered by the election shall prepare
1422 county election returns.
1523 (c) The county clerk shall certify [sign] the county returns
1624 [to certify their accuracy].
1725 (d) Not later than 24 hours after completion of the local
1826 canvass, the county clerk shall deliver to the secretary of state,
1927 in the manner directed by the secretary, the county returns [in a
2028 sealed envelope]. [The envelope shall be labeled: "Election
2129 Returns for __________ (name) County, for __________(election)."]
2230 SECTION 2. Sections 67.008(b) and (c), Election Code, are
2331 amended to read as follows:
2432 (b) The returns shall be delivered to the secretary of state
2533 as provided by Section 67.007. [, except that the envelope shall be
2634 labeled: "Returns of Election for Governor/Lieutenant Governor,
2735 __________ (name) County, for __________(election)."]
2836 (c) The secretary of state shall retain the returns [in
2937 their sealed condition] until the first day of the next regular
3038 legislative session, when the secretary shall deliver the returns
3139 to the speaker of the house of representatives.
3240 SECTION 3. Section 67.009(b), Election Code, is amended to
3341 read as follows:
3442 (b) With the delivery of the official county returns forms,
3543 the secretary of state shall deliver[:
3644 [(1)] written instructions on the preparation and
3745 delivery of the county election returns[; and
3846 [(2) the officially prescribed envelopes for
3947 delivering the returns to the secretary].
4048 SECTION 4. Section 181.032, Election Code, is amended by
4149 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
4250 follows:
4351 (b) Not later than the 10th day after the date of the filing
4452 deadline prescribed by Section 181.033, the authority with whom an
4553 application is filed shall deliver to the secretary of state a list
4654 containing:
4755 (1) each candidate's name;
4856 (2) each candidate's residence address;
4957 (3) the office sought by the candidate; [and]
5058 (4) the date on which the candidate filed the
5159 application; and
5260 (5) any additional information required by the
5361 secretary of state.
5462 (c) A list delivered under Subsection (b) must be in a
5563 format prescribed by the secretary of state.
5664 SECTION 5. Section 181.068(a), Election Code, is amended to
5765 read as follows:
5866 (a) The presiding officer of each convention held under this
5967 chapter shall certify, in a format prescribed by the secretary of
6068 state, [writing] for placement on the general election ballot the
6169 name and address of each candidate nominated by the convention.
6270 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
63- ______________________________ ______________________________
64- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
65- I certify that H.B. No. 2628 was passed by the House on May
66- 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 2, 2 present, not
67- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
68- No. 2628 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 7,
69- 2 present, not voting.
70- ______________________________
71- Chief Clerk of the House
72- I certify that H.B. No. 2628 was passed by the Senate, with
73- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
74- 1.
75- ______________________________
76- Secretary of the Senate
77- APPROVED: __________________
78- Date
79- __________________
80- Governor
71+ * * * * *