Senate | 05/10/2019 | Referred to Education | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Record vote RV#1221 | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Passed as amended | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Amended 1-Rosenthal and Toth | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Record vote RV#1162 | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Amended 4-Anchia | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Amended 3-Anchia | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Amended 2-J.D. Johnson | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Amended 1-Rosenthal | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Filed |