Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2706 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2706
1+By: Capriglione, Lambert H.B. No. 2706
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Nelson)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019;
4+ April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
5+ Affairs; May 15, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
7+ May 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2706 By: Zaffirini
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to authorized investments for governmental entities and a
615 study of the investment and management of funds by public schools.
716 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
817 SECTION 1. Sections 2256.011(a) and (b), Government Code,
918 are amended to read as follows:
1019 (a) A fully collateralized repurchase agreement is an
1120 authorized investment under this subchapter if the repurchase
1221 agreement:
1322 (1) has a defined termination date;
1423 (2) is secured by a combination of cash and
1524 obligations described by Section 2256.009(a)(1) or 2256.013 or, if
1625 applicable, Section 2256.0204; [and]
1726 (3) requires the securities being purchased by the
1827 entity or cash held by the entity to be pledged to the entity, held
1928 in the entity's name, and deposited at the time the investment is
2029 made with the entity or with a third party selected and approved by
2130 the entity; and
2231 (4) is placed through a primary government securities
2332 dealer, as defined by the Federal Reserve, or a financial
2433 institution doing business in this state.
2534 (b) In this section, "repurchase agreement" means a
2635 simultaneous agreement to buy, hold for a specified time, and sell
2736 back at a future date obligations described by Section
2837 2256.009(a)(1) or 2256.013 or, if applicable, Section 2256.0204, at
2938 a market value at the time the funds are disbursed of not less than
3039 the principal amount of the funds disbursed. The term includes a
3140 direct security repurchase agreement and a reverse security
3241 repurchase agreement.
3342 SECTION 2. Section 2256.013, Government Code, is amended to
3443 read as follows:
3544 Sec. 2256.013. AUTHORIZED INVESTMENTS: COMMERCIAL PAPER.
3645 Commercial paper is an authorized investment under this subchapter
3746 if the commercial paper:
3847 (1) has a stated maturity of 365 [270] days or fewer
3948 from the date of its issuance; and
4049 (2) is rated not less than A-1 or P-1 or an equivalent
4150 rating by at least:
4251 (A) two nationally recognized credit rating
4352 agencies; or
4453 (B) one nationally recognized credit rating
4554 agency and is fully secured by an irrevocable letter of credit
4655 issued by a bank organized and existing under the laws of the United
4756 States or any state.
4857 SECTION 3. Sections 2256.016(e) and (f), Government Code,
4958 are amended to read as follows:
5059 (e) In this section, for purposes of an investment pool for
5160 which a $1.00 net asset value is maintained, "yield" shall be
5261 calculated in accordance with regulations governing the
5362 registration of open-end management investment companies under the
5463 Investment Company Act of 1940, as promulgated from time to time by
5564 the federal Securities and Exchange Commission.
5665 (f) To be eligible to receive funds from and invest funds on
5766 behalf of an entity under this chapter:
5867 (1) [,] a public funds investment pool that uses
5968 amortized cost or fair value accounting must mark its portfolio to
6069 market daily; [,] and
6170 (2) if the investment pool uses amortized cost:
6271 (A) the investment pool must, to the extent
6372 reasonably possible, stabilize at a $1.00 net asset value, when
6473 rounded and expressed to two decimal places;
6574 (B) the governing body of the investment pool
6675 must, if [. If] the ratio of the market value of the portfolio
6776 divided by the book value of the portfolio is less than 0.995 or
6877 greater than 1.005, [the governing body of the public funds
6978 investment pool shall] take action as the body determines necessary
7079 to eliminate or reduce to the extent reasonably practicable any
7180 dilution or unfair result to existing participants, including a
7281 sale of portfolio holdings to attempt to maintain the ratio between
7382 0.995 and 1.005; and
7483 (C) the investment pool must, in [. In] addition
7584 to the requirements of its investment policy and any other forms of
7685 reporting, [a public funds investment pool that uses amortized cost
7786 shall] report yield to its investors in accordance with regulations
7887 of the federal Securities and Exchange Commission applicable to
7988 reporting by money market funds.
8089 SECTION 4. Subchapter A, Chapter 2256, Government Code, is
8190 amended by adding Section 2256.0208 to read as follows:
8291 Sec. 2256.0208. LOCAL GOVERNMENT INVESTMENT OF BOND
8392 PROCEEDS AND PLEDGED REVENUE. (a) In this section, "pledged
8493 revenue" means money pledged to the payment of or as security for:
8594 (1) bonds or other indebtedness issued by a local
8695 government;
8796 (2) obligations under a lease, installment sale, or
8897 other agreement of a local government; or
8998 (3) certificates of participation in a debt or
9099 obligation described by Subdivision (1) or (2).
91100 (b) The investment officer of a local government may invest
92101 bond proceeds or pledged revenue only to the extent permitted by
93102 this chapter, in accordance with:
94103 (1) statutory provisions governing the debt issuance
95104 or the agreement, as applicable; and
96105 (2) the local government's investment policy regarding
97106 the debt issuance or the agreement, as applicable.
98107 SECTION 5. Section 2256.0204(g), Government Code, is
99108 repealed.
100109 SECTION 6. (a) The Texas Education Agency shall conduct a
101110 study regarding the investment and management of funds by school
102111 districts and open-enrollment charter schools. On request of the
103112 agency, a district or school or the entity that invests or manages
104113 funds for the district or school, as appropriate, shall provide the
105114 agency information regarding:
106115 (1) the district's or school's investments, including
107116 asset allocations, fees, and risks; and
108117 (2) the district's or school's cash flow, fund
109118 balances, and other revenue sources.
110119 (b) Not later than June 1, 2020, the Texas Education Agency
111120 shall deliver a report to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
112121 the speaker of the house of representatives, and each standing
113122 committee of the legislature having primary jurisdiction over
114123 primary and secondary education that includes:
115124 (1) the findings of the study; and
116125 (2) any recommendations for legislative action based
117126 on the findings of the study.
118127 (c) This section expires September 1, 2021.
119128 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
120- ______________________________ ______________________________
121- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
122- I certify that H.B. No. 2706 was passed by the House on April
123- 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 4, 1 present, not
124- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
125- No. 2706 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 2,
126- 2 present, not voting.
127- ______________________________
128- Chief Clerk of the House
129- I certify that H.B. No. 2706 was passed by the Senate, with
130- amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
131- 0.
132- ______________________________
133- Secretary of the Senate
134- APPROVED: __________________
135- Date
136- __________________
137- Governor
129+ * * * * *