Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2706 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2019

                            H.B. No. 2706


 AN ACT
 relating to authorized investments for governmental entities and a
 study of the investment and management of funds by public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2256.011(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A fully collateralized repurchase agreement is an
 authorized investment under this subchapter if the repurchase
 agreement:
 (1)  has a defined termination date;
 (2)  is secured by a combination of cash and
 obligations described by Section 2256.009(a)(1) or 2256.013 or, if
 applicable, Section 2256.0204; [and]
 (3)  requires the securities being purchased by the
 entity or cash held by the entity to be pledged to the entity, held
 in the entity's name, and deposited at the time the investment is
 made with the entity or with a third party selected and approved by
 the entity; and
 (4)  is placed through a primary government securities
 dealer, as defined by the Federal Reserve, or a financial
 institution doing business in this state.
 (b)  In this section, "repurchase agreement" means a
 simultaneous agreement to buy, hold for a specified time, and sell
 back at a future date obligations described by Section
 2256.009(a)(1) or 2256.013 or, if applicable, Section 2256.0204, at
 a market value at the time the funds are disbursed of not less than
 the principal amount of the funds disbursed. The term includes a
 direct security repurchase agreement and a reverse security
 repurchase agreement.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2256.013, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2256.013.  AUTHORIZED INVESTMENTS: COMMERCIAL PAPER.
 Commercial paper is an authorized investment under this subchapter
 if the commercial paper:
 (1)  has a stated maturity of 365 [270] days or fewer
 from the date of its issuance; and
 (2)  is rated not less than A-1 or P-1 or an equivalent
 rating by at least:
 (A)  two nationally recognized credit rating
 agencies; or
 (B)  one nationally recognized credit rating
 agency and is fully secured by an irrevocable letter of credit
 issued by a bank organized and existing under the laws of the United
 States or any state.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 2256.016(e) and (f), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (e)  In this section, for purposes of an investment pool for
 which a $1.00 net asset value is maintained, "yield" shall be
 calculated in accordance with regulations governing the
 registration of open-end management investment companies under the
 Investment Company Act of 1940, as promulgated from time to time by
 the federal Securities and Exchange Commission.
 (f)  To be eligible to receive funds from and invest funds on
 behalf of an entity under this chapter:
 (1) [,]  a public funds investment pool that uses
 amortized cost or fair value accounting must mark its portfolio to
 market daily; [,] and
 (2)  if the investment pool uses amortized cost:
 (A)  the investment pool must, to the extent
 reasonably possible, stabilize at a $1.00 net asset value, when
 rounded and expressed to two decimal places;
 (B)  the governing body of the investment pool
 must, if [. If] the ratio of the market value of the portfolio
 divided by the book value of the portfolio is less than 0.995 or
 greater than 1.005, [the governing body of the public funds
 investment pool shall] take action as the body determines necessary
 to eliminate or reduce to the extent reasonably practicable any
 dilution or unfair result to existing participants, including a
 sale of portfolio holdings to attempt to maintain the ratio between
 0.995 and 1.005; and
 (C)  the investment pool must, in [. In] addition
 to the requirements of its investment policy and any other forms of
 reporting, [a public funds investment pool that uses amortized cost
 shall] report yield to its investors in accordance with regulations
 of the federal Securities and Exchange Commission applicable to
 reporting by money market funds.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2256, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2256.0208 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2256.0208.  LOCAL GOVERNMENT INVESTMENT OF BOND
 PROCEEDS AND PLEDGED REVENUE. (a)  In this section, "pledged
 revenue" means money pledged to the payment of or as security for:
 (1)  bonds or other indebtedness issued by a local
 government;
 (2)  obligations under a lease, installment sale, or
 other agreement of a local government; or
 (3)  certificates of participation in a debt or
 obligation described by Subdivision (1) or (2).
 (b)  The investment officer of a local government may invest
 bond proceeds or pledged revenue only to the extent permitted by
 this chapter, in accordance with:
 (1)   statutory provisions governing the debt issuance
 or the agreement, as applicable; and
 (2)  the local government's investment policy regarding
 the debt issuance or the agreement, as applicable.
 SECTION 5.  Section 2256.0204(g), Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 6.  (a)  The Texas Education Agency shall conduct a
 study regarding the investment and management of funds by school
 districts and open-enrollment charter schools.  On request of the
 agency, a district or school or the entity that invests or manages
 funds for the district or school, as appropriate, shall provide the
 agency information regarding:
 (1)  the district's or school's investments, including
 asset allocations, fees, and risks; and
 (2)  the district's or school's cash flow, fund
 balances, and other revenue sources.
 (b)  Not later than June 1, 2020, the Texas Education Agency
 shall deliver a report to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 the speaker of the house of representatives, and each standing
 committee of the legislature having primary jurisdiction over
 primary and secondary education that includes:
 (1)  the findings of the study; and
 (2)  any recommendations for legislative action based
 on the findings of the study.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2706 was passed by the House on April
 25, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 4, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2706 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 2,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2706 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor