|
06/14/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/14/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Record vote RV#1728
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#473
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Record vote RV#435
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Point of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 5-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Amended 4-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Record vote RV#434
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 3-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 2-Gervin-Hawkins
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 2-Gervin-Hawkins
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Amended 1-Lozano
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2019
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|