Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2837 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2019
Bill April 12, 2019