Senate | 05/15/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Co-sponsor authorized | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Record vote RV#583 | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Record vote RV#555 | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Referred to Human Services | ||
House | 11/12/2018 | Filed |