By: Toth, Romero, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 2858 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2019; May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to adoption of a uniform swimming pool and spa code for use in municipalities in this state. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. The heading to Subchapter C, Chapter 214, Local Government Code, is amended to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER C. SWIMMING POOLS AND SPAS [POOL ENCLOSURES] SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 214, Local Government Code, is amended by adding Section 214.103 to read as follows: Sec. 214.103. INTERNATIONAL SWIMMING POOL AND SPA CODE. (a) In this section, "International Swimming Pool and Spa Code" means the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code promulgated by the International Code Council. (b) To protect the public health, safety, and welfare, the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code, as it existed on May 1, 2019, is adopted as the municipal swimming pool and spa code in this state. (c) The International Swimming Pool and Spa Code applies to all construction, alteration, remodeling, enlargement, and repair of swimming pools and spas in a municipality that elects to regulate pools or spas, including under Section 214.101. (d) A municipality may establish procedures for: (1) the adoption of local amendments to the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code; and (2) the administration and enforcement of the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code. (e) A municipality may review and adopt amendments made by the International Code Council to the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code after May 1, 2019. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *